Solorio v. Fresno County Department of Behavioral Health Services et al
Plaintiff: Graciela Solorio
Defendant: Kevin Briggs Jonson, Fresno County Department of Behavioral Health Services and Evan Merat
Case Number: 1:2014cv01284
Filed: August 15, 2014
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER on Plaintiff's 18 Motion for Reconsideration signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/9/2014. (Sant Agata, S)
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER DENYING 23 Motion to Proceed IFP as MOOT, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/13/2014. (Marrujo, C)
November 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER on Plaintiff's 18 Motion for Reconsideration, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/6/2014. (Marrujo, C)
October 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss 11 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/16/14. CASE CLOSED. (Verduzco, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Solorio v. Fresno County Department of Behavioral Health Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Briggs Jonson
Represented By: Michael Robert Linden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fresno County Department of Behavioral Health Services
Represented By: Michael Robert Linden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evan Merat
Represented By: Michael Robert Linden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Graciela Solorio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?