Cooper v. Igbinosa et al

Plaintiff: Craig B Cooper
Defendant: Felix Igbinosa, James Yates, Matthew Cate and A. Schwarzenegger
Case Number: 1:2014cv01297
Filed: August 19, 2014
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Referring Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 30, 2015 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's Request for Records 26 , signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 11/30/15: Plaintiff's request is denied as moot. (Hellings, J)
November 17, 2015 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING Plaintiff's In Forma Pauperis Status on Appeal signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 11/17/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
September 22, 2015 17 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Dismissal of Second Amended Complaint Without Leave to Amend; ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Request for Judicial Notice 16 , signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 9/22/15: Thirty-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
February 23, 2015 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING First Amended Complaint WITH LEAVE TO AMEND, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 2/22/15: Thirty-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
October 21, 2014 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 11 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 10/21/14. (Verduzco, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooper v. Igbinosa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig B Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Felix Igbinosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Cate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Schwarzenegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?