St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company et al v. Centex Homes et al
Plaintiff: St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company, Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut and Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Defendant: Centex Homes and Centex Real Estate Corporation
Case Number: 1:2014cv01384
Filed: August 22, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Nevada
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Re Stipulation To Dismiss (Doc. 48 ), signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/27/2016. CASE CLOSED.(Fahrney, E)
January 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER on 34 REQUEST for Dismissal Without Prejudice of Certain Claims of Plaintiffs' Complaint signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/20/2015. (Lundstrom, T)
December 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION and ORDER Extending Time for Travelers to File Amended Complaint, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/23/14. Amended Complaint due by 1/16/2015. (Gonzalez, R)
December 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER RE DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS (Doc. 11 ), Signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/10/2014. The Court GRANTS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND Centexs motion to dismiss Plaintiffs complaint (Doc. 11 ). Plaintiffs shall file any further amended complaint on or before January 2, 2015. (Arellano, S.)
September 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER assigning new case number signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 9/22/2014. (Lundstrom, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company et al v. Centex Homes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: Abel Eric Aguilera
Represented By: Raymond E. Brown
Represented By: Kari Marie Myron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut
Represented By: Abel Eric Aguilera
Represented By: Raymond E. Brown
Represented By: Kari Marie Myron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Represented By: Abel Eric Aguilera
Represented By: Raymond E. Brown
Represented By: Kari Marie Myron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centex Homes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centex Real Estate Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?