Acosta v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Richard Nicholas Acosta, Sr.
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2014cv01422
Filed: September 11, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Stanislaus
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Granting Motion for Attorney Fees Pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 406(b) (Doc. 23 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/17/2018. The Court ORDERS: (1) The motion for attorney fees pursuant to 24 U.S.C. §406(b) in the amount of $21,642.90, net of the previously awarded fee of $3,934.24 under the Equal Access to Justice Act (EAJA), for a total award of $17,708.66 is GRANTED; (2) The Commissioner shall pay the amount directly to Counsel, Shellie Lott. (Valdez, E)
October 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION and ORDER FOR THE AWARD OF ATTORNEY FEES PURSUANT TO THE EQUAL ACCESS TO JUSTICE ACT, 28 U.S.C. § 2412(d), signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/15/2015. (Kusamura, W)
July 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re Stipulation for Voluntary Remand Pursuant to Sentence Four signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/22/2015. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
June 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION and ORDER for Extension. Based upon the stipulation of the parties, and for cause shown, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant shall have an extension of time, to and including July 29, 2015, in which to file Defendants opposition to Plaintiffs Opening Brief. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/30/2015. (Herman, H)
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION and ORDER Extending Plaintiff's Time to File an Opening Brief: Plaintiff shall have an extension of time, to and including May 27, 2015, in which to file Plaintiffs Opening Brief in Support of Plaintiffs Complaint; and that all other deadlines set forth in the September 12, 2014 Case Management Order shall be extended accordingly. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/20/2015. (Herman, H)
September 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/12/2014. (Jessen, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acosta v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Nicholas Acosta, Sr.
Represented By: Shellie Lott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Esther Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?