Edwards et al v. Department of State Hospitals (DSH) - Coalinga
Plaintiff: Larry L. Edwards and Alan M. Hildreth
Defendant: Department of State Hospitals (DSH) - Coalinga
Case Number: 1:2014cv01435
Filed: September 15, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: UnassignedDJ
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting 30 Motion to Dismiss and Dismissing Plaintiff's Complaint with prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/7/2015. CASE CLOSED. (Lundstrom, T)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss with Leave to Amend 23 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/1/15. 30-Day Deadline. (Verduzco, M)
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER VACATING Hearing Date of March 13, 2015 and TAKING Matter UNDER SUBMISSION. No Appearance Required. Motion to Dismiss pro se Plaintiffs Larry Edwards and Alan Hildreths (Plaintiffs) First Amended Complaint hearing on March 13, 2015 is VACATED. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/4/2015. (Herman, H)
December 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Granting Defendant's 8 Motion to Dismiss with Leave to Amend signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/19/2014. Amended Complaint due by 1/26/2015.(Flores, E)
December 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER VACATING the hearing date of December 12, 2014, in re the Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike, document 8 , and taking the matter under submission of as that date pursuant to Local Rule 230(g). No party shall appear for said hearing. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/8/2014. (Rooney, M)
September 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Pro Se InFormational ORDER. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/22/2014. (Herman, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards et al v. Department of State Hospitals (DSH) - Coalinga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry L. Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan M. Hildreth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of State Hospitals (DSH) - Coalinga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?