J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Martinez
Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions, Inc.
Defendant: Martin Carrillo Martinez
Case Number: 1:2014cv01578
Filed: October 8, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: UnassignedDJ
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:553
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 AMENDED ORDER of Dismissal: the order of dismissal entered in this matter on August 3, 2017, is amended to reflect the stipulation of the parties (Doc. 76), that only Plaintiff's claims for Violation of Title 47 U.S.C Section 553 and Violation of California Business and Professions Code Section 17200 are voluntarily dismissed with prejudice. The case shall remain closed. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/21/2017. (Herman, H)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER of Dismissal, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/3/17. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER GRANTING IN PART 66 Plaintiff's Motion for Damages, Attorney's Fees, and Costs signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 5/10/2017. Plaintiff's Status Report due within fourteen (14) days. (Jessen, A)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule on Plaintiff's Motion for Damages Attorneys' Fees and Costs; ORDER Vacating Scheduling Conference Date of March 2, 2017; No Party Shall Appear, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/27/17. Hearing set for 5/2/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Gonzalez, R)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER Continuing Scheduling Conference (re Doc. 61 - Ex Parte Application by plaintiff): SCHEDULING CONFERENCE is continued from 2/23/2017 to March 2, 2017 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe . A JOINT Proposed Briefing Schedule for Plaintiffs Motion for Damages, Attorneys Fees, and Costs, shall be electronically filed, one (1) full week prior to the Scheduling Conference, and a copy shall be e-mailed, in Word format, to bamorders@c aed.uscourts.gov. Parties wishing to appear telephonically at the scheduling conference may do so by using the following dial-in number and passcode: dial-in number 1-877-411-9748; passcode 3190866. Plaintiff shall also serve a copy of this Order on the defendant and thereafter file a Certification of Service of this Order with the Clerk of the Court. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/15/2017. (Herman, H)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 43 Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/6/2017. (Gaumnitz, R)
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Discharging Order to Show Cause, and Setting Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment 48 , signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 12/6/16: Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment Hearing set for 12/20/2016 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Hellings, J)
November 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Vacating Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment; ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment Should Not be Granted, and Requiring Defendant to submit Written Opposition; ORDER Directing Clerk of the Court to Serve this Order on Defendant, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/7/16. 28-Day Deadline. (Verduzco, M)
October 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER VACATING the Settlement Conference Date of October 12, 2016: and no party shall appear at that time. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/6/2016. (Herman, H)
July 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Regarding Settlement Conference (set for October 17, 2016 at 9:30 am before Judge McAuliffe). PERSONAL Appearance by Plaintiff and Defense Counsel Required. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/22/2016. (Herman, H)
March 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Discharging Order to Show Cause; ORDER Directing Clerk to Amend Caption, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/10/16. (Verduzco, M)
March 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 INFORMATIONAL ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/7/16. (Verduzco, M)
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE to Defendant Martin Carrillo Martinez Why Sanctions Should not be Imposed including Entry of Default. ORDER SETTING Show Cause Hearing: for Monday, March 7, 2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge B arbara A. McAuliffe. (1) Defendant shall respond to this Order to Show Cause, in writing, no later than February 29, 2016; (2) Defendants written statement SHALL identify his current physical address, telephone number, and ema il address, if any. If his contact information has changed, he shall explain why he failed to keep the Court apprised of his contact information. He shall also advise the Court whether he intends to continue to defend this action; (3) The Court also SETS a Show Cause Hearing for March 7, 2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before United States Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. Defendant may appear by telephone by contacting Plaintiff at telephone number (626)799-979 prior t o the conference; (4) Plaintiff SHALL appear at the show cause hearing by telephone; (5) The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve this Order to Show Cause on Defendant by mail. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/17/2016. (Herman, H)
January 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/6/2016 FINDING that the 22 Findings and Recommendations are supported by the record and by the proper analysis; GRANTING 18 Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default; DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to set a side default as to Defendant Martin Carrillo Martinez, individually and dba La Nayarita Restaurant; DENYING 14 Motion for Default Judgment as moot; DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to serve this order on Defendant Martin Carrillo Martinez at 14446 Lyle Street, Sylmar, California 91342. (Michel, G.)
August 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 FINDINGS And RECOMMENDATIONS Granting Defendant's Motion To Set Aside Clerk's Entry Of Default (Doc. 18 ), ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion For Default Judgment As Moot (Doc. 14 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/3/2015. F&R's referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections to F&R due by 8/21/2015. (Fahrney, E)
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER CONSTRUING DEFENDANT'S LETTER AS AN ANSWER AND MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AND ORDERING PLAINTIFF TO FILE A RESPONSE AND DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO UPDATE HIS ADDRESS WITH THE COURT signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/29/2015. (Filing Deadline set for 7/10/2015 for Plaintiff to file a Response and for Defendant to submit his current mailing address). (Lundstrom, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Peter Riley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Carrillo Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?