State of California v. Picayune Rancheria of Chukchansi Indians of California
Plaintiff: State of California
Defendant: Picayune Rancheria of Chukchansi Indians of California
Amicus: UNITE HERE Local 19
Case Number: 1:2014cv01593
Filed: October 10, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER RE OBJECTIONS FILED BY MONICA DAVIS TRIBAL COUNCIL AND DECLINING TO MODIFY JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/22/15. (Coffman, Lisa)
November 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, REQUEST FOR A CEASE AND DESIST ORDER, AND/OR REQUEST FOR AN ACCOUNTING (Doc. 83) signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on November 19, 2015. (Munoz, I)
November 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER REQUESTING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING AND VACATING NOVEMBER 12, 2015 HEARING, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/2/2015. (Kusamura, W)
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER DENYING LEWIS/AYALA FACTION'S MOTION FOR ORDER MODIFYING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (DOC. 79) signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on July 21, 2015. (Munoz, I)
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER Re Letter From Tribal Council Board of Distributees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/16/2015. (Hernandez, M)
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting in part request to continue Scheduling Conference from 2/24/2015 to 4/21/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/18/2015. (Hernandez, M)
February 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER DENYING REID FACTIONS MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (DOC. 58) signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on February 10, 2015. (Munoz, I)
December 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER to continue the Scheduling Conference to 2/24/2015 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/30/2014. (Hernandez, M)
October 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting 25 Motion for Preliminary Injunction signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/29/14. (Coffman, Lisa)
October 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER EXTENDING DURATION OF TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER PURSUANT TO FED.R.CIV.P. 65(b)(2) signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on October 23, 2014. (Munoz, I)
October 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER 2 signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on October 10, 2014. (Munoz, I)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of California v. Picayune Rancheria of Chukchansi Indians of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Picayune Rancheria of Chukchansi Indians of California
Represented By: Geoffrey Michael Hash
Represented By: Lester John Marston
Represented By: Gary J Montana, PHV
Represented By: John M. Peebles
Represented By: James Joseph Qaqundah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of California
Represented By: William Philip Torngren
Represented By: William L. Williams, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: UNITE HERE Local 19
Represented By: Kristin Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?