Johnson v. Frauenheim et al
Plaintiff: Lacedric W Johnson
Defendant: Scott Frauenheim, R. Fisher, A. Shimmin, J.C. Herrera, J.A. Mendez, J. Woodard, J. Bejinez, S. Deshazo, D. Erickson and S. Espinoza
Case Number: 1:2014cv01601
Filed: October 14, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO ALTER OR AMEND JUDGMENT signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/4/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER SETTING Deadline for Plaintiff to File a Reply to Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Request to Amend or Alter Judgment under Rule 59(e); Fourteen (14) Day Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/19/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Barry M. Kurren on 1/4/2017 recommending that 30 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT regarding Exhaustion be granted and that 54 MOTION to STRIKE Plaintiff's Surreply be denied as moot. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Objections to F&R due within 14-Days. (Lundstrom, T)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/16/2016 adopting 47 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS to deny 43 Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief. (Lundstrom, T)
July 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER DENYING 49 Plaintiff's Motion for Substitution of Defendant signed by Magistrate Judge Barry M. Kurren on 7/18/2016. (Jessen, A)
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 43 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunctive Relief be DENIED re 7 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/18/2016. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R due within twenty-one (21) days. (Jessen, A)
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER MODIFYING Scheduling Order STAYING Action other than that Related to the Issue of Exhaustion and Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/25/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
October 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER striking 24 Reply to Answer signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/29/2015. (Lundstrom, T)
October 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER striking unsigned 22 Reply filed by Lacedric W Johnson signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/26/2015. (Lundstrom, T)
October 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DENYING 16 Motion for Sanctions, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/9/15. (Martin-Gill, S)
July 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DIRECTING that Action Proceed on Claims Found to be Cognizable in First Screening Order, and Dismissing other Claims and Parties; ORDER REFERRING Matter back to Magistrate Judge to Initiate Service of Process, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 07/9/15. Defendants: Beard, J.C. Herrera, J.A. Mendez, A. Shimmin, J. Woodard, R. Fisher and Scott Frauenheim (Warden) terminated. (Martin-Gill, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Frauenheim et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lacedric W Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Frauenheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Shimmin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.C. Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.A. Mendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Woodard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Bejinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Deshazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Espinoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?