Robbins v. Lackner, et al.
Plaintiff: Earl J. Robbins
Defendant: Hedi M Lackner, S. Winn-Reed, T. Jenkins and C. Koenig
Case Number: 1:2014cv01609
Filed: September 23, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Tuolumne
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 18 Motion to Stop Payments for Filing Fee, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 11/3/2015. (Martin-Gill, S)
September 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DISMISSING 11 First Amended Comlaint without Leave to Amend signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 9/22/2015. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
August 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Denying 14 Plaintiff's Motion to Expedite Case, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 8/13/15. (Gonzalez, R)
July 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DENYING 12 Motion for Copy of Complaint and Docket Report signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 7/15/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
October 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER of INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:14-cv-2208 EFB) to Fresno (1:14-cv-1609 DLB) signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/14/14. (Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robbins v. Lackner, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl J. Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hedi M Lackner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Winn-Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Koenig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?