Tagle v. Cal-Trans
Plaintiff: Victor Tagle
Defendant: Cal-Trans
Case Number: 1:2014cv01617
Filed: October 3, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: UnassignedDJ
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Dismissing Action for Failure to State a Claim, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/17/15. CASE CLOSED. (Verduzco, M)
June 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DISMISSING 1 COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/30/2015. Amended Complaint due by 8/3/2015.(Lundstrom, T)
November 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 FIRST INFORMATIONAL ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/4/2014. (Fahrney, E)
October 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento to Fresno (1:14-cv-1617 DLB) signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/15/14. (Kaminski, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tagle v. Cal-Trans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Tagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cal-Trans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?