Windham v. Davies, et al.
Plaintiff: Charles W. Windham
Defendant: Dave Davies, T. Cano, R. Rubio and J. Vargas
Case Number: 1:2014cv01651
Filed: October 7, 2014
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER DISMISSING CASE signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 4/28/2015. CASE CLOSED.(Lundstrom, T)
April 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER DENYING 20 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of Court's March 30, 2015, Order Denying Appointment of Counsel signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 4/22/2015. (Jessen, A)
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DENYING 17 , 18 Plaintiff's Requests for Judicial Notice signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/13/2015. (Jessen, A)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 15 Request for Appointment of Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/27/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
October 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:14-cv-2345 KJN) to Fresno (1:14-cv-1651 SAB) signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/21/14. (Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Windham v. Davies, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles W. Windham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Davies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Cano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Rubio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Vargas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?