Barbour v. Allenby et al
Plaintiff: Robert Barbour
Defendant: Cliff Allenby, Audrey King, Tom Voss, Pam Ahlin and Stephen Mayberg
Case Number: 1:2014cv01696
Filed: October 30, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Dismiss 1 Action Without Prejudice for Failure to Obey a Court Order and Failure to Prosecute; Fourteen (14) Day Objection Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 4/7/2015. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Objections to F&R due by 4/27/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
February 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS To: (1) Dismiss Complaint For Failure To State A Claim, (2) Direct Clerk's Office To Send Habeas Petition Form, And (3) Require Plaintiff To File Habeas Petition Or Notice Of Voluntary Dismissal Within Thirty Days (ECF No. 1 ), Fourteen (14) Day Objection Deadline, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 2/6/2015. F&R's referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 2/24/2015. (Fahrney, E)
December 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER (1) GRANTING Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Docs. 2 & 3 ); (2) VACATING 9 Order Requiring Plaintiff to Submit Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis or Pay Filing Fee, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 12/15/2014. (Marrujo, C)
December 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RELATING Cases, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 12/15/2014. (Marrujo, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barbour v. Allenby et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Barbour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cliff Allenby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Audrey King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Voss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pam Ahlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Mayberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?