Glass v. Gregory et al
Plaintiff: Donald Glass
Defendant: A. Gregory, S Duran, M. Galvin, J. R. Garza, J. Stiles, Greg Blanchi and T Arlitz
Case Number: 1:2014cv01703
Filed: October 31, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER denying Motion for New Trial signed by District Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 7/8/2016. (Lundstrom, T)
April 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 25 Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by District Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 4/12/16. CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C)
February 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GRANTING 32 Motion and AMENDING Scheduling and Planning Order, signed by Chief Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 2/2/16. (Marrujo, C)
November 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Re: Notice at Docket 27 , signed by Chief Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 11/12/15: Plaintiff is granted through and including Friday, December 11, 2015, within which to serve and file his opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. (Hellings, J)
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER re 25 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT signed by Chief Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 10/19/2015. (Lundstrom, T)
September 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Denying Motion To Amend Complaint (Doc. 22 ), signed by Chief Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 9/4/2015. (Fahrney, E)
July 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER striking 16 Amended Complaint signed by Chief Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 7/28/2015. (Lundstrom, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glass v. Gregory et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Glass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Gregory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Duran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Galvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. R. Garza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Stiles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Blanchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Arlitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?