Crawford v. City of Bakersfield et al
Plaintiff: Leslie Laray Crawford
Defendant: City of Bakersfield and Aaron Stringer
Case Number: 1:2014cv01735
Filed: November 6, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: UnassignedDJ
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 127 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL; Pre-Trial Conference:August 27, 2021, at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 9; Trial: October 12, 2021, at 8:30 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/30/2020. (Hernandez, M)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE for 10/29/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. A Joint Scheduling Conference Report is due one week before the conference date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/7/2020. (Hernandez, M)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER RE JOINT STATUS REPORT ON DEFENDANTS' PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: The parties shall file a joint status report regarding the status of Defendants' petition for writ of certiorari within six (6) months o f issuance of this order; and if Defendants' petition for writ of certiorari is denied prior to the expiration of the six (6) month period, the parties shall file a joint status report within fourteen (14) days of the date of denial. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/6/2020. (Apodaca, P)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER FOLLOWING STATUS CONFERENCE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: The parties shall file a joint status report regarding Defendants writ of certiorari on or before April 3, 2020; and Within three (3) days of the date of entry of this order, Mr. Meiselas shall file the appropriate paperwork to appear in this action as counsel for Plaintiff if he has not already done so. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/21/2020. (Hernandez, M)
December 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER Disregarding 100 Motion to Proceed IFP and Directing Clerk of Court to Forward Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis to Ninth Circuit signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/05/2016. (Flores, E)
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 89 JUDGMENT dated *10/20/16* in favor of Defendants against Plaintiff pursuant to order. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
October 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER and Receipt for Trial Exhibits signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/20/2016. (Flores, E)
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER RE DEFENDANTS MOTIONS IN LIMINE NO. 1 and 9 55 Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/13/2016. (Hernandez, M)
October 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER RE MOTIONS IN LIMINE AND BIFURCATING TRIAL FOR PURPOSES OF LIABILITY AND DAMAGES 45 46 48 [49-50] 52 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/6/2016. (Hernandez, M)
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING EVIDENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/14/2016. (Hernandez, M)
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER DENYING 34 DEFENDANT CITY OF BAKERSFIELD AND DEFENDANT AARON STRINGER'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Defendant City of Bakersfield and Defendant Aaron Stringers objection to Scott De Foes report is sustained; andDefendant City of Bakersfield and Defendant Aaron Stringers motion for summary judgment is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/31/2016. (Hernandez, M)
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Vacating March 23, 2016 Hearing; Granting Defendants' 29 Motion to Join Michael Dozer as a Nominal Defendant; and Directing Plaintiff's to Serve Michael Dozer with a Copy of the Summons and Complaint within Twenty Days; ORDER Vacating February 18, 2016 Order Dismissing Michael Dozer from this Action signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 03/17/2016. (Flores, E)
February 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Dismissing Defendant Michael Dozer Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m) signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 02/17/2016. Michael Dozer (an individual) terminated.(Flores, E)
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE WHY MICHAEL DOZER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FROM THIS ACTION FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH RULE 4(m) OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURES. TEN DAY DEADLINE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/1/2016. (Hernandez, M)
May 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Permitting Filing of First Amended Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 05/22/2015. Amended Complaint due by 5/27/2015.(Flores, E)
March 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/24/2015. (Hernandez, M)
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING MANDATORY Scheduling Conference for 3/3/2015 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/16/2015. (Hernandez, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crawford v. City of Bakersfield et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Laray Crawford
Represented By: Brian T. Dunn
Represented By: Megan Ruth Gyongyos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Bakersfield
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Virginia Anne Gennaro
Represented By: Michael G Marderosian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Stringer
Represented By: Heather Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Virginia Anne Gennaro
Represented By: Michael G Marderosian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?