Henshaw v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Tami Lanea Henshaw
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2014cv01788
Filed: November 14, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Stanislaus
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES PURSUANT TO 42 U.S.C. § 406(b), signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/8/2019. (Kusamura, W)
July 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees and Expenses 25 . Plaintiff's motion for EAJA fees and expenses is GRANTED IN PART in the amount of $ 5,784.52. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/5/2016. (Timken, A)
February 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/11/16: The case is REMANDED to the ALJ; The Clerk of this Court is DIRECTED to enter judgment in favor of Plaintiff and against Defendant. (CASE CLOSED)(Hellings, J)
September 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER on Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. Plaintiff shall file an opening brief on or before October 8, 2015; the Commissioner shall file a responsive brief on or before November 10, 2015; and Plaintiff may file a reply brief on or before November 25, 2015. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/10/2015. (Timken, A)
August 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION and ORDER for EXTENSION of Time to File Opening Brief. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/7/2015. (Timken, A)
July 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING Extention of Time for Plaintiff to File Opening Brief. Plaintiff shall file an opening brief on or before August 10, 2015; the Commissioner shall file a responsive brief on or before September 14, 2015; and Plaintiff may file a reply brief on or before October 2, 2015. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/13/2015. (Timken, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henshaw v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tami Lanea Henshaw
Represented By: Jacqueline Anna Forslund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?