United States of America v. 13.03 Acres of Land, et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Joseph M. Hannegan, Success Development Company, Barbara Brown, Chicago Title Insurance Company, Heirs and Assigns of Gary A. Christensen, Heirs and Assigns of Eva C. Christensen, Tulare County Treasurer and Tax Collector and 13.03 Acres of Land
Case Number: 1:2014cv01816
Filed: November 19, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Tulare
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Land Condemnation
Cause of Action: 40:258
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER 66 for FINAL JUDGMENT in EMINENT DOMAIN signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/11/2015. The full and just compensation payable by United States for taking of estates in subject property is $1,656,000, which sum is all inclusive. Judgment shall be, and is hereby, entered against United States of America in the amount of $1,656,000. Just compensation has been properly paid and distributed to parties entitled to receive just compensation herein. (Marciel, M)
February 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 62 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/12/15 re: 60 DISMISSING Defendant Tulare County Treasurer and Tax Collector as Defendant in this action. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to terminate said Defendant from the Of ficial Docket of this case; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, after this Order is served upon Tulare County, no further documents in this case need to be served upon said Defendant. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that said Tulare County may be omitted from the caption of this case in all future filings. IF IS FURTHER ORDERED that other Defendants remain in the case, which is to remain open. Tulare County Treasurer and Tax Collector terminated.(Meuleman, A)
February 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER FOR DELIVERY OF POSSESSION signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/9/2015. (Zignago, K.)
January 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/14/15. The Clerk shall distribute $1,656,000.00 by check made payable to "Joseph M. Hannegan, Trustee Under the Joseph M. Hannegan Family Trust Dated May 3, 1989" as soon as possible, and no later than 30 days after the date of entry of this order. Upon payment the Clerk is directed to enter satisfaction of judgment of record as to the Trustee. (cc: Financial) (Manzer, C)
January 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/6/2015 DISMISSING Defendant Chicago Title Insurance Company; DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to terminate said defendant from the official docket; ORDERING that no further documents be served on Defendant Chicago Title Insurance Company; ORDERING that Defendant Chicago Title Insurance Company be omitted from the caption of this case in all future filings. (Michel, G)
December 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/16/14 ORDERING that Defendant Rosedale Water Company (a California corporation) is DISMISSED as Defendant in this Action. The Clerk is directed to terminate said Defendant from t he Official Docket of this case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, after this Order is served upon ROSEDALE, no further documents in this case need to be served upon said Defendant. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that said ROSEDALE may be omitted from the caption of this case in all future filings. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that other Defendants remain in the case, which is to remain open. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
December 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/10/14 ORDERING that Defendant JOYCE D. TZUGARIS AKA JOYCE D. KING AKA J.D. TZUGARIS AKA J.D. KING is dismissed as Defendant in this action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that other Defendants remain in the case, which is to remain open. (Becknal, R)
December 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/5/2014 ORDERING that Defendant Arlene R. Reynolds (Trustee under the Reynolds Survivor's Trust) is DISMISSED as Defendant in this action. (Zignago, K.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. 13.03 Acres of Land, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Lynn Trinka Ernce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph M. Hannegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Success Development Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Title Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heirs and Assigns of Gary A. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heirs and Assigns of Eva C. Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tulare County Treasurer and Tax Collector
Represented By: Kathleen A. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 13.03 Acres of Land
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?