Freibaum v. Holland, et al.
Plaintiff: Alan Freibaum
Defendant: K. Holland, S. Shiesha, Jane Doe #1, R. Sanders, John Doe #1 and Johne Doe #2
Case Number: 1:2014cv01832
Filed: November 21, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Madera
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER directing Clerk of Court to randomly assign District Judge to action. FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to dismiss action, with prejudice, for failure to obey court orders and failure to prosecute 39 , 45 signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/8/2017. The case is assigned to and referred to District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. The new case number is 1:14-cv-01832-AWI-BAM-(PC). Objections to F&R's due within 14-Days. (Lundstrom, T)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE why this Action Should Not be Dismissed for Failure to Obey a Court Order and Failure to Prosecute, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/30/17. Show Cause Response Due Within Twenty Days. (Gonzalez, R)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying 21 Motion for Preliminary Injunction signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/1/2016. (Lundstrom, T)
March 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER to Recaption Case; Jane Doe #1 is now S. Wootton, R.N., signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 03/02/2016. (Martin-Gill, S)
August 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DENYING 11 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/4/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
November 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/24/2014. (Lundstrom, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freibaum v. Holland, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Freibaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Shiesha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johne Doe #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?