Osolinski v. Bigot et al
Plaintiff: David N. Osolinski
Defendant: Marisa Bigot and Doe
Case Number: 1:2014cv01895
Filed: December 1, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER declining to exercise Supplemental Jurisdiction and closing case signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/5/2016. CASE CLOSED.(Lundstrom, T)
April 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Dismissal of Action for Failure to State a Cognizable Claim Upon Which Relief May be Granted, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/8/15. Referred to Judge Ishii; 30-Day Deadline. (Verduzco, M)
January 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT, WITH LEAVE TO AMEND, for Failure to State a Cognizable Claim for Relief and Denying Plaintiff's 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 Motions signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 01/27/2015. Amended Complaint due by 3/2/2015. (Flores, E)
January 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DENYING 9 Motion for Entry of Default as Premature, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/9/15. (Marrujo, C)
December 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 7 Motion to Correct the Docket, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/30/2014. (Marrujo, C)
December 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting 2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/10/2014. (Lundstrom, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Osolinski v. Bigot et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David N. Osolinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marisa Bigot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?