Feiger v. Smith et al
Plaintiff: Robert Feiger
Defendant: Marlene Smith, Natalie Clark and Antoneya Graves
Case Number: 1:2014cv01920
Filed: December 2, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to CLOSE the CASE signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/20/2018. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER on Second Stipulation to Extend Dispositional Document Filing Deadline After Settlement, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/1/2018: Dispositional Document deadline EXTENDED to 2/23/2018; Status Conference set for 3/5/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean.(Hellings, J)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 111 STIPULATION to EXTEND Dispositional Document Filing Deadline After Settlement; ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/21/17. Dispositive Documents Deadline: 1/31/2018. (Gonzalez, R)
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER Following Settlement; VACATING Pending Matters and Dates and Directing Parties to File Dispositive Documents,signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/21/17. (Dispositive Motions filed 30-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER & WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum for Robert Feiger, CDCR# T-65167 11/21/2017, 8:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone at the U.S. District Court, Courtroom #9, Fresno, CA re 100 signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/13/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 SECOND STIPULATION TO AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER; and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/5/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER on Stipulation to Amend Scheduling Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/14/2017. Non-Expert Discovery Cutoff: 11/10/2017. Expert Discovery Cutoff: 1/31/2018. Expert Disclosures: 12/12/2017. Rebuttal Expert Disclosures: 1/11/2018. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline: 4/11/2018. Status Conference RESET for 10/19/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Jessen, A)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER Granting 51 Motion for Appointment of Pro Bono Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/3/17. Appointed Tanya E. Moore for Robert Feiger. (Gonzalez, R)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER on Attorney General Office's Request for Clarification of Order After Initial Scheduling Conference re 71 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/31/17. (Gonzalez, R)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 68 Motion to conduct discovery; Request for court issued subpoenas and Motion for reconsideration of denial of Motion to appoint counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/20/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER After Initial Scheduling Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/10/17. (Marrujo, C)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER ADOPTING 38 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 21 Motion to Dismiss; This case is referred back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/31/2017. (Martin-Gill, S)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Granting Defendant Natalie Clark's 53 Request for Extension of Time to Serve Initial Disclosures and Denying Request to Continue Initial Scheduling Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/17/17. (Gonzalez, R)
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER denying 39 Motion to conduct Discovery and denying in part 40 Motion for Extension of Time signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/16/2016. (Lundstrom, T)
December 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting 41 Motion for Extension of Time to serve initial disclosures and to reschedule the initial scheduling conference signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/15/2016. (Initial Scheduling Conference reset for 3/6/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean). (Lundstrom, T)
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that 21 MOTION to DISMISS be granted in part and denied in part signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/16/2016. Referred to Judge Dale A Drozd; Objections to F&R due by 12/22/2016.(Lundstrom, T)
November 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/15/2016 requiring Initial Disclosures and setting Initial Scheduling Conference for 1/30/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean.(Lundstrom, T)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 31 Motion for Continuance of Settlement Conference as Moot signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 08/31/2016. (Flores, E)
August 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 30 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/23/16. (Martin-Gill, S)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER & WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum for Robert Feiger, CDCR# T-65167 on September 29, 2016 at 9:00 a.m., before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe at the U.S. District Court, Courtroom #8, Fresno, CA, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 07/28/2016. (Martin-Gill, S)
June 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF to File Opposition or Statement of Non-Opposition to 21 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Within Thirty (30) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/9/2016. (Jessen, A)
December 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' Request for Screening Order and Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading 7 , signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 12/11/14: 30-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Feiger v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Feiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marlene Smith
Represented By: Stanton W. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natalie Clark
Represented By: Stanton W. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antoneya Graves
Represented By: Stanton W. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?