Noble v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Brooke Noble
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2014cv01963
Filed: December 10, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis on Appeal, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/2017. (Appellate Case No. 17-17294)(Martin-Gill, S)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 177 Motion for Reconsideration, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/6/2017. (Gaumnitz, R)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER GRANTING 154 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/9/2017. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART Defendant's Motion to Compel and for Sanctions 123 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/20/17. (Hellings, J)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 156 AMENDED ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Sanctions Should Not be Imposed for Failure to Comply With Subpoena, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/3/17. Show Cause Response due by 5/19/2017. (Copy of this order and 123 served on Latif Ziyar via FedEx.) (Marrujo, C)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER STRIKING plaintiff's response to the 3/28/2017 order to show cause, document 153 . Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/19/2017. (Rooney, M)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Sanctions Should Not be Imposed for Failure to Comply With Subpoena, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/27/17. Show Cause Response Due By 4/14/2017. (Copy of this order and 123 served to Latif Ziyar.)(Marrujo, C)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER resolving discovery dispute as to the location of the new Rule 30(B)(6) deposition. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/8/2017. (Rooney, M)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER following 3/6/2017 discovery dispute hearing. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/7/2017. (Rooney, M)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER taking under advisement defendant's Motion to Compel and for Sanctions, document 123 , and granting in part, and denying in part, plaintiff's Motion to Compel and for Sanctions, document 129 . The Court sets a Telephonic Discovery D ispute Conference for 3/6/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. The Court further directs the parties to comply with the deadlines listed herein. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/27/2017. (Rooney, M)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 133 Order setting briefing schedule, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/24/2017. (Wells Fargo Opposition due by 2/24/2017; Plaintiff's Reply due by 2/26/2017; Plaintiff's Motion for Sanction Hearing set for 2/27/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean) (Rosales, O)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER DENYING plaintiff's Motion to Strike, document 121 , and Defendant Wells Fargo's Motion for Protective Order, document 119 , and vacating the hearings associated with said motions. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/7/2017. (Rooney, M)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER After In Camera Review signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/18/2017. (Rooney, M)
July 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 87 Order setting a mandatory scheduling conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/8/2016. (Initial Scheduling Conference set for 8/31/2016 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean) (Rosales, O)
July 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 86 Order Granting Defendants' Motions to Strike or Dismiss Defendants Robert Landucci, Scott Harris, And Marlene Hubbell (Docs. 43 47 57 ); Order Denying Plaintiff's Motions and Requests for Leave to Amend Her Complaint to add Defendants (Docs. 61 65 66 ); Order Denying as Moot Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (Doc. 71 ); Order Denying as Moot Motions to Strike or Dismiss the Amended Complaint Filed on Behalf of Defendants Landucci, Harris, and Hubbell (Docs. 46 55 56 [ 58]); Order Denying Motion to Strike or Dismiss the Amended Complaint Filed on Behalf of Defendant Wells Fargo (Doc. 27 ), signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/1/2016. (The matter is referred to the assigned magistrate judge for purposes of scheduling further proceedings in this action. Robert Landucci, Scott Harris, and Marlene Hubbell are dismissed.) (Gaumnitz, R)
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER Resetting Hearings and Directing Submission of Additional Briefing, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/12/2016. (1. The motions currently pending before this court 27 , 43 , 46 , 47 , 53 , 55 , 56 , 57 , 58 , and 61 are reset for hearing on 5/17/2016 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. 2. Plaintiff is directed to file a supplemental brief clarifying her state law basis as to each named defendant's alleged duty of care, by 5 /3/2016. Plaintiff's brief may be no longer than five pages in length. 3. Defendants are granted leave to collectively file, at their election, a single opposition brief in response to plaintiff's supplemental brief, by 5/10/2016. Defendants' brief may be no longer than five pages in length.)(Gaumnitz, R)
February 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/24/16 ORDERING that the deadline for defendants Harris and Hubbell to respond to the First Amended Complaint is EXTENDED to 3/14/2016. (Kastilahn, A)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 [DISREGARD SEE CLERK'S NOTICE [ 45 ]ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/8/2016 GRANTING Wells Fargo's Motion 43 Dropping Sham Defendants; Robert Landucci, Scott Harris and Marlene Hubbell are hereby DROPPED from this action pursuant to FRCP 21. (Reader, L) Modified on 2/8/2016 (Reader, L).
December 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/1/2015 GRANTING plaintiff's 30 Ex Parte Application for leave to file late Opposition. Plaintiff shall filed her papers by 12/30/2015. Defendant shall file Reply, if any, by 1/7/2016. The 12/10/2015 27 Motions to Dismiss Hearing is VACATED and CONTINUED to 1/14/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) on the 15th Floor. (Marciel, M)
September 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting 12 Motion to Dismiss, signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/24/15. Plaintiff is GRANTED leave to amend. Should Plaintiff elect to amend, it must be filed with this Court within 21 days from the entry of this order. (Kastilahn, A)
December 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s Application to Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint re 6 signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/16/2014. (Martinez, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Noble v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brooke Noble
Represented By: NCAED Lenore Albert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Kamran Javandel
Represented By: Keith D. Yandell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?