Berna v. Department of Justice Bureau of Firearms et al
Plaintiff: Bruce Berna
Defendant: Department of Justice Bureau of Firearms and Sonia Rios
Case Number: 1:2014cv01972
Filed: December 11, 2014
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: UnassignedDJ
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that the second amended complaint, document 13 , be dismissed, without leave to amend. Matter referred to District Judge John A. Mendez, with objections to the findings and recommendations due within 30 days of service of this order. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/14/2015. (Rooney, M)
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER VACATING 9 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and DIRECTING Plaintiff to File an Amended Complaint on or Before May 18, 2015, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/13/2015. (Jessen, A)
March 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS that this Action be Dismissed for Failure to State a Claim (Doc. 5 ); Objections due Within Thirty (30) Days, Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/31/2015. Matter referred to U.S. District Judge John A. Mendez. (Arellano, S.)
February 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/24/2015. Second Amended Complaint due by 3/30/2015. (Lundstrom, T)
December 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT, with leave to amend. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint within thirty days of service of this order. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/22/2014. (Rooney, M)
December 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Granting Application To Proceed In Forma Pauperis, ORDER Directing Payment Of Inmate Filing Fee By California Department Of Corrections And Rehabilitation (Doc. 2 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/12/2014. (Fahrney, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berna v. Department of Justice Bureau of Firearms et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Berna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Justice Bureau of Firearms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonia Rios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?