Williams v. Biter
Plaintiff: Gerry Williams
Defendant: Martin D. Biter
Case Number: 1:2014cv02076
Filed: December 29, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 47 Motion for Reconsideration, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/17/19. CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Adopting Findings and Recommendations 35 , and Granting in Part and Defendants' 25 Motion to Dismiss, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/9/19. (Gonzalez, R)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 40 Request for a Status Report; ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Send Plaintiff a Copy of the Docket Sheet signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 07/25/2017. (Flores, E)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that Defendant's 25 Motion to Dismiss be Granted in Part signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 01/30/2017. Referred to Judge Drozd; Objections to F&R due by 3/6/2017. (Flores, E)
August 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE and WARNING of REQUIREMENTS for Opposing Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Exhaust signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/22/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
April 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 18 Motion for a Screening Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 04/13/2016. (Martin-Gill, S)
May 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 14 Request for Judicial Notice signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 05/16/2015. (Flores, E)
April 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Finding that Plaintiff has Paid the Filing Fee in Full for this Action; ORDER Vacating 8 Findings and Recommendations of February 26, 2015; ORDER for Clerk to Reflect on the Court's Docket Plaintiff's $50.00 Payment Received on February 13, 2015, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/31/15. (Verduzco, M)
February 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Dismiss Case For Failure to Obey Court Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/26/2015, referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R Due Within Thirty Days. (Marrujo, C)
January 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER To Pay $50.00 Balance Owed For Filing Fees, Within 30 Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/15/2015. Filing Fee Balance Deadline: 2/18/2015)(Fahrney, E)
January 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DENYING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP; ORDER for Plaintiff to Pay $400.00 Filing Fee in Full Within Thirty Days, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/8/15. (Marrujo, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Biter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin D. Biter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerry Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?