Eleson v. Lizarraga, et al.
Petitioner: Eric Richard Eleson
Respondent: Joe A. Lizarraga and Edmund G. Brown, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2015cv00008
Filed: January 5, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Amador
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Denying 27 Motion for Reconsideration, signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/27/15. (Verduzco, M)
July 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Denying 18 Petitioner's Motion to Recuse and Motion to Strike Order; ORDER Denying Petitioner's Request to Certify Challenge to Constitutionality of Statute, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/23/15. (Gonzalez, R)
June 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DENYING Petitioner's 16 Motion to Expedite Ruling, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 06/23/2015. (Martin-Gill, S)
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/23/2015 recommending that 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus be dismissed. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 7/27/2015. (Lundstrom, T)
February 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/25/15: 30-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
January 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DISREGARDING as Moot Petitioner's Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis 5 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/13/15. (Hellings, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eleson v. Lizarraga, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Eric Richard Eleson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Joe A. Lizarraga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Edmund G. Brown, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?