Huskey v. Lopez, et al.
Plaintiff: Kenneth R. Huskey
Defendant: Jose Isai Lopez, Audrey King, David Lewright, James - Walters, Jack Carter, Francisco Moreno, Richard Alonzo, Lisa Jimenez, Ruben Guajardo and Jonathan Neubarth
Case Number: 1:2015cv00138
Filed: February 2, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER DISMISSING Action with Prejudice per Stipulation, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 09/29/17. CASE CLOSED (Martin-Gill, S)
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Setting Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/19/17. Settlement Conference set for 9/18/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. (Marrujo, C)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 29 Motion for Summary Judgment; 21-Day Deadline to File Statements Whether a Settlement Conference Would be Beneficial, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/14/17. (Marrujo, C)
September 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER Extending Discovery and Dispositive Motion Deadlines Nun Pro Tunc re 25 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/6/16. Discovery due by 12/15/2016, Dispositive Motions filed by 2/24/2017. (Gonzalez, R)
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER DENYING Motion for Appointment of Counsel 20 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/1/15: Motion is DENIED without prejudice. (Hellings, J)
October 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Default Should Not Be Entered, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/22/15. Defendants' Show Cause Response due by 11/9/2015. (Gonzalez, R)
July 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DISCHARGING Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order, Temporary Restraining Order, and Preliminary Injunction 3 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/8/15. (Hellings, J)
February 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting 2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/6/2015. (Lundstrom, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huskey v. Lopez, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth R. Huskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Isai Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Audrey King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Lewright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James - Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francisco Moreno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Alonzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Jimenez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruben Guajardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Neubarth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?