Gutilla v. Aerotek, Inc.,
Plaintiff: Laura Gutilla
Defendant: Aerotek, Inc.,
Case Number: 1:2015cv00191
Filed: February 5, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT and Directing the Clerk of Court to Close the Case signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/21/2017. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Directing Parties to Submit Supplemental Briefing Regarding Approval of Settlement, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/9/2017. (Hearing on Final Approval of Settlement is set for 3/21/2017, at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd.)(Gaumnitz, R)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 JOINT Status Report and Request for Additional Time to Submit Stipulated Dismissal; ORDER - all dates and hearings are hereby vacated and the Court will retain jurisdiction of this matter. The parties shall file a StipulatedRequest for Dismissal within 30 days of this Order or by January 23, 2017. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/22/2016. (Herman, H)
April 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION and ORDER For Extension of Discovery and Motion Deadlines and For Continuance of Trial Date, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/25/2016. (The current pre-trial deadlines and trial date are hereby vacated and the new deadlines an d trial date are as follows- Expert Disclosures: 10/5/2016, Supplemental Expert Disclosures: 11/8/2016, Non-expert Discovery: 11/4/2016, Expert Discovery: 11/18/2016, Dispositive Filing: 12/2/2016, Settlement Conference set for 12/1/2016 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe, Pretrial Conference set for 3/6/2017 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd, and Jury Trial set for 5/2/2017 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd.)(Gaumnitz, R) Modified (corrected year for trial date) on 4/25/2016 (Gaumnitz, R).
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting Joint Stipulation (Doc. 14) for Extension of Discovery and Motion Deadlines. The dates set forth in the Courts Scheduling Order of May 7, 2015 are extended and the new deadlines are as follows: Expert Disclosures: February 26, 201 6; Supplemental Expert Disclosures: March 25, 2016; Non-expert Discovery: May 6, 2016; Expert Discovery: June 3, 2016; Dispositive Filing: June 10, 2016. The Court denies extending the dispositive filing deadline to June 24, 2016. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/21/2016. (Herman, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gutilla v. Aerotek, Inc.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aerotek, Inc.,
Represented By: Michael W Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Gutilla
Represented By: Robert Joshua Wasserman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?