A.V. v. Panama Buena Vista Union School District
Plaintiff: A. V.
Defendant: Panama Buena Vista Union School District
Case Number: 1:2015cv00246
Filed: February 17, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: UnassignedDJ
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 20:1400 Civil Rights of Handicapped Child
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 169 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 6/7/2018 DISMISSING this case in its entirety with prejudice pursuant to 166 Stipulation. (Fabillaran, J)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 5/16/2018 GRANTING 150 Petition to Approve Compromise of Minor's Claim and APPROVING the settlement reached by the parties. From the minor's settlement proceeds, fees and expen ses in the amount of $62,000 shall be paid by one or more checks or drafts, drawn payable to the order of "Concepcion Varela,Guardian ad litem for A.V, and their attorneys, Law Office of Nicole Hodge Amey." Within 21 days of the date of service of this Order, the parties shall file the appropriate stipulation for voluntary dismissal with this Court. (York, M)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 1/10/2018 ORDERING that the last sentence of the Courts 1/9/2018 Memorandumand Order, which directed the Clerk of Court to close the file, was made in error and is hereby STRICKEN. The Clerk i s therefore ORDERED to reopen the case in order to permit the adjudication of Plaintiffs remaining claims. The 138 Motion Hearing is SET for 1/25/2018. The parties are also DIRECTED to file a Joint Status Report not later than 30 days following the Courts ruling on Defendants currently pending Motion to Dismiss/Motion to Strike. CASE REOPENED. (Hunt, G)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 141 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 1/8/18: Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment/Appeal of Administrative Hearing Decisions 116 is DENIED. The challenged OAH decisions are hereby affirmed. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the file. (Kaminski, H)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 11/09/17 GRANTING 94 Motion to Strike or to Dismiss is GRANTED to the extent that no viable claims against the individually named Defendants have been asserted. The District's Motio n is also GRANTED on sovereign immunity grounds to the extent that Plaintiff's Fifth and Sixth Counts against the District rely either on California's Unruh Act or upon 42 U.S.C. § 1983. The District's Motion is otherwise DENIED. To the extent Plaintiff wishes to file a Third Amended Complaint, he must do so within 20 days. (Benson, A.)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 10/30/2017 GRANTING 96 Motion to Supplement the Administrative Record; GRANTING 98 Motion toSupplement the Record on Appeal. (Washington, S)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 01/18/2017 ORDERING that the current set dates for fact discovery completion and expert disclosures and that all dates related to the District's anticipated partial motion for summary j udgment (non-IDEA) (see ECF No. 84) are VACATED pending rulings by this Court on the District's motion to strike and/or dismiss Plaintiff's second amended complaint (ECF No. 94) and the Parties' cross-motions for summary judgment in t heir appeals under the Individuals with Disabilities Education Act, 20 U.S.C. § 1410 et seq. (ECF Nos. 115, 116). The parties are DIRECTED to file a Joint Status Report not later than 30 days following the last ruling on the above enumerated motions which proposes new deadlines for adjudication of the non-IDEA portions of this matter. (Jackson, T)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER After Informal Telephonic Conference re: Discovery Dispute, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/19/2016. (Hall, S)
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 109 SEALING ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 9/23/16 ORDERING the Parties motion to seal is GRANTED, and the full Administrative Record shall be filed under SEAL. (Becknal, R)
July 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER GRANTING IN PART 78 Defendant's Motion to Compel Discovery, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/8/2016. (Hall, S)
June 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER GRANTING IN PART 72 Plaintiff's Motion for a Protective Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/20/2016. (Hall, S)
June 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 86 AMENDED MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 6/13/2016 ORDERING For all the reasons set forth in this order, the District's 23 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED with leave to amend in PART and DENIED in PART c onsistent with the foregoing; Not later than 20 days following the date this memorandum and order is electronically filed, Plaintiff may, but is not required to, file an amended complaint; if no amended complaint is filed by that date, the causes of action dismissed by virtue of this order will be dismissed with prejudice upon no further notice to the parties. (Reader, L)
June 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 23 Motion to Dismiss signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 6/8/16. Not later than 20 days following the date this memorandum and order is electronically filed, Plaintiff may, but is not required to, file an amended complaint. If no amended complaint is filed by that date, the causes of action dismissed by virtue of this order will be dismissed with prejudice upon no further notice to the parties. (Kastilahn, A)
January 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 1/11/2016 RELATING case(s) 1:15-CV-246 MCE JLT and 1:15-CV-1375 TLN JLT REASSIGNING CASE 1:15-CV-1375 to Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. for all further proceedings; any dates currently set in this reassigned case only are herebyVACATED; the Clerk of the Court is to issue an Order Requiring Joint Status Report; District Judge Troy L. Nunley no longer assigned to case. New Case Number: 1:15-CV-1375 MCE JLT.(Reader, L)
September 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING the Matter to VDRP re 9 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/9/2015. Case Referred to VDRP. Case STAYED. Status Conference re Consent / Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/26/2015 at 09:30 AM is VACATED. (Hall, S)
March 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DISCHARGING 4 the Order to Show Cause Dated February 24, 2015; ORDER GRANTING 5 Petition to Appoint Concepcion Varela as Guardian ad Litem for Minor Plaintiff A.V., signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/12/2015. (Hall, S)
February 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING 1 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; ORDER to Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE Why the Action Should Not Be Dismissed, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/24/2015. Show Cause Response due within 21 days. (Hall, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A.V. v. Panama Buena Vista Union School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panama Buena Vista Union School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. V.
Represented By: Nicole Hodge Amey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?