Russell v. Toar et al
Plaintiff: Roderick Bryon Russell, Jr.
Defendant: K. Toar and Woodward
Case Number: 1:2015cv00255
Filed: February 17, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Madera
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Granting Defendant's 24 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/10/18. Referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R Due Within Thirty Days. (Gonzalez, R)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to File Opposition or Statement of Non-Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment Within Twenty-One (21) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/2/2018. (Jessen, A)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER ADOPTING 23 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS AND DISMISSING Certain Claims and Defendants, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 01/7/18. (Martin-Gill, S)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Dismissing Certain Defendants and DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Randomly Assign Action to a District Judge; Fourteen Day Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/30/2017. Referred to Judge Dale A. Drozd. Objections to F&R due by 12/18/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
February 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Extending Time to File a Second Amended Complaint; Thirty Day Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/24/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Russell v. Toar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roderick Bryon Russell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Toar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woodward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?