Athwal et al v. County of Stanislaus et al
Plaintiff: Baljit Athwal, Navneet Athwal, Daljit Atwal and Karan Inc.
Defendant: County of Stanislaus, City of Turlock, City of Modesto, City of Ceres, Stanislaus County Office of the District Attorney, Kirk Bunch, Jon Evers, Timothy Redd, Dale Lingerfelt, Steve Jacobson, Birgit Fladager, Galen Carroll and Paul Edward Jones
Case Number: 1:2015cv00311
Filed: February 26, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Sutter
Presiding Judge: UnassignedDJ
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/13/2022 GRANTING-IN-PART AND DENYING-IN-PART 172 , 174 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs may file an amended complaint not later than 30 days from the electronic filing date of this Order.(Perdue, C.)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER DENYING 201 Plaintiff's Motions to Compel County Defendant to Produce David Harris and Marlissa Ferreira for Deposition Without Prejudice; ORDER ISSUING Limited Protective Order as to Depositions of David Harris and Marlissa Ferreira, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/28/2022. (Marrujo, C)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 192 STIPULATION and ORDER 191 signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 4/6/2022 ORDERING the "official capacity" claims against Galen Carroll DISMISSED, and Plaintiffs' reference to the Fourteenth Amendment in the Second Cause of Action STRICKEN. (Krueger, M)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 4/5/2022 DISMISSING Stanislaus County Office of the District Attorney. The "official capacity" 172 claims against Kirk Bunch and Birgit Fladager are DISMISSED. The reference to the Fourteenth Amendment in Plaintiffs' Second Cause of Action is STRICKEN.(Reader, L)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 186 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/29/2022 ORDERING the page limit for Plaintiffs' Oppositions to Defendants' FRCP 12(b)(6) motions to dismiss is extended to 25. (Zignago, K.)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/21/2022 IT IS SO ORDERED The settlement between Plaintiffs Baljit Athwal, Daljit Atwal, the City of Turlock, the City of Ceres, and Timothy Redd is hereby DEEMED to be a good faith settlement within the meaning and effect of CA Code of Civil Procedure sections 877 and 877.6. Any further claims of any joint tortfeasors or co-obligors relating to the subject matter of this lawsuit against the City of Turlock, City of Ceres, and Timothy Redd for eq uitable comparative contribution, or partial or comparative indemnity, based on comparative negligence or comparative fault are hereby forever barred and dismissed with prejudice pursuant to CA Code of Civil Procedure section 877.6, subdivision (c).(Reader, L)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 182 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/17/22 as to the settlement between plaintiffs Baljit Athwal and Daljit Atwal and defendants Turlock and Ceres. (Kastilahn, A)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 176 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/1/22 CONTINUING the briefing schedule as follows: Plaintiffs' Oppositions to Defendants' FRCP12(b)(6) motions to dismiss: 4/11/22; Defendants' Replies (if any): 5/26/22; hearing date: 6/16/22, at 2 p.m.. (Kastilahn, A)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 171 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/8/21 ORDERING the following briefing schedule: defendants' FRCP 12(b)(6) motions to dismiss: 1/10/22, plaintiff's opposition: 3/11/22, defendants' replies (in any): 4/11/22, hearing date: 4/21/22 at 2 p.m.. (Kastilahn, A)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 167 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/26/2021 CONTINUING The deadline to 11/18/2021 to file Amended Complaint. The Defendants' responsive pleading shall be filed no later than 30 days after service of the Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/12/21, per 163 Stipulation, ORDERING that the settlement reached and entered into between Jones and Plaintiff represents a Good Faith Settlement; any and all pending or potential claims, whether by cross-complaint or other action related to, or arising out of action filed by Plaintiff against Jones for equitable comparative contribution, or partial or comparative indemnity, based on comparative negligence or comparative fault, is BARRED. (Benson, A.)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER Regarding Discovery Dispute, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/1/2021. (Case Management Deadline: 14-Day)(Martin-Gill, S)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/27/2021 GRANTING 94 , 95 , 100 Motions to Dismiss. The First Amended Complaint DISMISSED in its entirety with leave to amend. Plaintiffs shall file their amended complaint not later than 30 days from the electronic filing date of this Order. Defendants shall file their responsive pleading not later than 21 days thereafter. (Reader, L)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS AMENDED MOTION TO COMPEL 142 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 07/22/2021, (Case Management Deadline: 30-Day Deadline)(Martin-Gill, S)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER RE Discovery Dispute signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/15/2021. Status Conference set for 5/21/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Sant Agata, S)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER setting Deadline for completion of Non-Expert Discovery; ORDER setting further Status / Scheduling Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/7/2020. Status Conference set for 4/6/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe.(Lundstrom, T) Modified date on 12/8/2020. (Valdez, E)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 122 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/13/2020 CONSOLIDATING these matters for the purposes of discovery. (Huang, H)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 91 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 8/17/2020 and agreed between the parties to EXTEND the deadline for defendants City of Modesto, Chief Galen Carroll, and Detective Jon Evers's response to the First Amended Complaint shall be extended by two weeks to 9/1/2020. (Yin, K)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 7/28/2020 GRANTING 67 Motion to Amend the Complaint. The Court ORDERS Plaintiffs to file their amended complaint not later than fourteen (14) days from the electronic filing of this Order. Defendants shall file a responsive pleading no later than twenty-one (21) days after the filing of Plaintiffs' amended complaint. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 75 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/15/2020 RELATING cases 1:13-cv-00311-TLN-BAM, 1:18-cv-00496-AWI-EPG, 1:18-cv-1403-DAD-SKO, 1:20-cv-00747-AWI-EPG, and 1:20-cv-00770-AWI-JDP. Actions denominated 1:18-cv-00496-AWI-EPG; 1 :18-cv-1403-DAD-SKO; 1:20-cv-00747-AWI-EPG; and 1:20-cv-00770-AWI-JDP are REASSIGNED to District Judge Troy L. Nunley and Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe, and the captions shall read, respectively, 1:18-cv-00496-TLN-BAM; 1:18-cv-1403-TLN-BAM; 1 :20-cv-00747-TLN-BAM; and 1:20-cv-00770-TLN-BAM. Any dates currently set in the reassigned cases are hereby VACATED, and the parties are ordered to refile any pending motions before this Court. The Clerk of the Court is to issue the Initial Pretrial Scheduling Order. (Zignago, K.)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Stipulated PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/21/19. (Marrujo, C)
October 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/08/15 ORDERING that this matter is STAYED indefinitely until the criminal action is ended. Plaintiffs shall advise the Court, by filing an appropriate motion or stipulation, when the criminal case is ended. CASE STAYED (Benson, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Athwal et al v. County of Stanislaus et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baljit Athwal
Represented By: Somnath Raj Chatterjee
Represented By: Arturo Jorge Gonzalez
Represented By: Kevin Love Hubbard
Represented By: Pablo A. Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Navneet Athwal
Represented By: Somnath Raj Chatterjee
Represented By: Arturo Jorge Gonzalez
Represented By: Kevin Love Hubbard
Represented By: Pablo A. Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daljit Atwal
Represented By: Somnath Raj Chatterjee
Represented By: Arturo Jorge Gonzalez
Represented By: Kevin Love Hubbard
Represented By: Pablo A. Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karan Inc.
Represented By: Somnath Raj Chatterjee
Represented By: Arturo Jorge Gonzalez
Represented By: Kevin Love Hubbard
Represented By: Pablo A. Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Stanislaus
Represented By: John Robert Whitefleet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Turlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Modesto
Represented By: Lillian Kae Yoo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Ceres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanislaus County Office of the District Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirk Bunch
Represented By: John Robert Whitefleet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Evers
Represented By: Lillian Kae Yoo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Redd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Lingerfelt
Represented By: John Robert Whitefleet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Jacobson
Represented By: John Robert Whitefleet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Birgit Fladager
Represented By: John Robert Whitefleet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Galen Carroll
Represented By: Lillian Kae Yoo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Edward Jones
Represented By: Michelle Renee Bonoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?