Sullivan v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Sharon R. Sullivan
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2015cv00376
Filed: March 8, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Stanislaus
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Stipulation and Order for award of attorneys fees under the Equal Access to Justice Act (EAJA), signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/9/2017. (Rosales, O)
October 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's Social Security Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/05/2016. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)
December 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER for Extension of Time re 18 signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/28/2015. (Martinez, A)
March 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting 3 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 03/10/2015. (Flores, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sullivan v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon R. Sullivan
Represented By: Jacqueline Anna Forslund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Sharon Lahey, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?