Queen v. Matevousian
Petitioner: Nicholas Queen
Respondent: A. Matevousian
Case Number: 1:2015cv00413
Filed: March 16, 2015
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Merced
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER DISREGARDING Petitioner's 41 Motion for More Definite Statement; ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to RETURN any Further Submissions from Petitioner without Filing signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/9/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT SECOND MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND DENYING PETITIONER'S MOTION TO AMEND PETITION 37 signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/25/2016. (Lundstrom, T)
January 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER DENYING 31 & 34 Petitioner's Second and Third Motions for Reconsideration; and ORDER GRANTING 32 & 33 Petitioner's Motions to Amend Second Motion for Reconsideration signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/11/2016. (Jessen, A)
December 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Denying 26 Petitioner's Motion for Reconsideration, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/4/15. (Gonzalez, R)
November 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING Respondent's Motion to Dismiss 21 ; ORDER DISMISSING Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 1 ; ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Enter Judgment and Close File; ORDER DECLINING to Issue Certificate of Appealability; ORDER DENYING All Pending MOtions as Moot 15 , 18 , 19 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/12/15. (CASE CLOSED)(Hellings, J)
April 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting Petitioner's Motion To Supplement Petition (Doc. 8 ), signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/16/2015. (Fahrney, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Queen v. Matevousian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Nicholas Queen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: A. Matevousian
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: Litigation Coordinator
Represented By: US Attorney's Office- 2241 Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?