King v. Biter et al
Plaintiff: Larry Donnell King
Defendant: M. D. Biter, D. Tarnoff, S. Tallerico, D. Foston, B Daveiga, J. Acebedo, J Castro and Lawless
Case Number: 1:2015cv00414
Filed: December 8, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 131 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Defendant Biter's 118 Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 02/03/2021. Referred to Judge Unassigned; Objections to F&R due by 3/11/2021.(Flores, E)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 130 STIPULATION and ORDER DISMISSING Defendants J. Acebedo and D. Tarnoff signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/13/2021.(Sant Agata, S)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER VACATING Hearing Set for October 7, 2020, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/5/2020. The matter is taken under submission. (Rivera, O)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER Approving 120 Parties' Stipulation to Continue the Motion for Summary Judgment Hearing and Briefing Schedule signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/9/2020. Opposition to Motion due by 9/16/2020. Defendants' Reply due by 9/30/2020. Motion Hearing set for 10/7/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Jessen, A)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER APPROVING Parties' Stipulation to Withdraw Plaintiff's 112 114 Motions to Compel, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/28/2020. (Marrujo, C)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 107 Motion for Reconsideration of the Magistrate Judge's March 26, 2020 Order, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 6/15/2020. (Martin-Gill, S)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER GRANTING Parties' Request to Extend the Dispositive Motion Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/26/2020. Dispositive Motions filed by 7/31/2020. (Jessen, A)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER Dismissing Defendants J. Castro and C. Lawless Pursuant to 105 Parties' Stipulation signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/2/2020. (Rivera, O)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER GRANTING 97 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Extension of Discovery Deadline for Written Discovery signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/16/2019. (Jessen, A)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER APPROVING Parties' Stipulation to Extend the Discovery and Dispositive Motion Deadlines signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/24/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER & WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Inmate Larry Donnell King, Sr. #J-30173 to Corcoran State Prison on 07/12/2019, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/12/19. (Gonzalez, R)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER SETTING Settlement Conference on July 12, 2019 and STAYING CASE for Seventy-Five (75) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/7/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 Amended Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/2/19. Discovery Deadline: August 2, 2019; Dispositive Motion Deadline: October 2, 2019. (Marrujo, C)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/1/2018 re Defendants' 68 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT for failure to exhaust the administrative remedies. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 4/5/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 60 Motion to Compel, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/8/18. (Martin-Gill, S)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER OVERRULING Plaintiff's 62 Objections to Defendants' Motion to Extend the Deadline to File an Exhaustion-Related Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/30/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER GRANTING 58 Defendants' Motion to Extend the Time to File an Exhaustion-Related Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/22/2017. Motion due by 2/5/2018. (Jessen, A)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Regarding Defendants' 55 Request for Clarification of the Court's August 23, 2017, Discovery and Scheduling Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 08/31/2017. (Flores, E)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Adjudication and Settlement of the Case 51 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/27/17. (Hellings, J)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion to Compel and Request for Imposition of Sanctions 42 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/25/17. (Hellings, J)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion to Amend the Complaint, Directing Clerk of Court to File Second Amended Complaint, and GRANTING Defendants Thirty Days to File a Response 43 , 45 , 47 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/21/17. (Hellings, J)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Granting Defendants' 38 Motion to Compel and Modification of Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/1/17. (Gonzalez, R)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to TERMINATE Defendant Tallerico Pursuant to Order Dated January 30, 2017, and DIRECTING Defendants Tarnoff, Acebedo, Castro, Lawless, and Biter to File a Response to Complaint within Twenty Days From the Date of Service of this Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/15/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/24/2016 regarding Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 24 , 28 . Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 11/30/2016. (Lundstrom, T)
February 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DISMISSING Certain Defendants From Action for Failure to State a Cognizable Claim and Referring Matter Back to Magistrate Judge for Initiation of Service of Process signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 2/11/2016. Defendants B. Daveiga and D. Foston terminated. (Jessen, A)
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER of INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:14-cv-2864 JAM CMK) to Fresno (1:15-cv-0414 SKO) signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 3/16/15. (Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King v. Biter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Donnell King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. D. Biter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Tarnoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Tallerico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Foston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B Daveiga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Acebedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?