Duffy v. Los Banos Unified School District et al
Plaintiff: Mark Duffy
Defendant: Los Banos Unified School District, Veli Gurgen, Daniel Sutton, Steve Tietjen and Ryan Hartsoch
Case Number: 1:2015cv00423
Filed: March 17, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Merced
Presiding Judge: UnassignedDJ
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER re Stipulation for Dismissal of Entire Action With Prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/9/2018. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 Order DENYING IN PART Plaintiff's 85 Motion in Limine and inviting further briefing, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 9/28/2017. (Rosales, O)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING the parties' request for an extension of various pretrial dates as follows: 1) The September 26, 2017 deadline for the parties to file their Motions in Limine is hereby vacated and reset to September 27, 2017; 2) The September 26, 2017 deadline for the parties to file their Joint Proposed Jury Instructions is hereby vacated and reset to September 27, 2017; and 3) The September 28, 2017 deadline for the parties to file their optional replies to Motions in Limine is vacated and reset to September 29, 2017. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 9/26/2017. (Rooney, M)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER DENYING defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, document 60 . Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 9/5/2017. (Rooney, M)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING the parties' request for an extension of the Dispositive Motions filing deadline as follows: Dispositive Motions to be filed by 6/2/2017. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/2/2017. (Rooney, M)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 STIPULATION and ORDER MODIFYING SCHEDULING ORDER: Non-Expert Discovery Deadline 8/31/2016 (unchanged); Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 4/25/2017; Rebuttal Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 5/19/2017; Expert Discovery Deadline 6/16/2017 ; Non-Dispositive Motions filed by 6/27/2017; Dispositive Motions filed by 4/14/2017 (unchanged); Pretrial Conference set for 8/17/2017 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean; Jury Trial set for 10/10/2017 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean (6-8 day estimate). Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/10/2017. (Rooney, M)
July 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 STIPULATION and ORDER MODIFYING SCHEDULING ORDER as follows: Non-Expert Discovery due by 8/31/2016; Expert Discovery due by 3/20/2017; Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 9/30/2016; Rebuttal Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 11/8/2016; Non-D ispositive Motions filed by 12/15/2016; Dispositive Motions filed by 4/14/2017; Pretrial Conference set for 7/20/2017 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean; Jury Trial set for 9/12/2017 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/20/2016. (Rooney, M)
June 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Stipulated Protective Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/27/2016. (Rosales, O)
December 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATION and ORDER to Continue Deadline to Exchange FRCP Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/28/2015. (Martinez, A)
October 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER RE: Defendants' 15 Motion to Dismiss signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/28/2015. (Martinez, A)
April 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis re 3 , 6 signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/9/2015. (Martinez, A)
April 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Complete His Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/8/2015. (Martinez, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duffy v. Los Banos Unified School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Los Banos Unified School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veli Gurgen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Sutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Tietjen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Hartsoch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Duffy
Represented By: Kevin Gerard Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?