United States of America et al v. Somina, Inc., et al.
Plaintiff: United States of America, State of California and Nicole O'Neill
Defendant: Somina, Inc., Primary Anesthesia Services, McKesson Corporation, Robert Goldstein, Roy Winston, Byron Mendenhall, Quinn Gee and Margaret Vassilev, M.D.
Case Number: 1:2015cv00433
Filed: March 19, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Tulare
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Nature of Suit: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 142 Order APPROVING stipulation to amend scheduling order, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/13/2019. (Non expert Discovery due by 6/30/2020; Expert Disclosure due by 5/11/2020; Rebuttal Expert Disclosure due by 6/8/2020; Expert Discovery due by 7/7/2020) (Rosales, O.)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 128 Order GRANTING IN PART relator Nicolle O'Neill's 124 Motion to Compel production of documents; Order setting status conference for June 12, 2019,at 3:30 pm, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/30/2019. (Status Conferenc e set for 6/12/2019 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean) To participate telephonically, the parties are directed to use the following dial-in number and passcode: 1-888-251-2909; passcode 1024453. (Rosales, O.)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 123 Order DISCHARGING Order to Show Cause and directing Relator/ Plaintiff to file Motion to Compel, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/25/2019. (Rosales, O.)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 121 Order to show cause for failure to appear, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/12/2019. Show Cause Response due by 3/18/2019. (Rosales, O.)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER DENYING Relator's 101 Motion for Entry of Final Judgment, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/14/19. (Marrujo, C)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 116 STIPULATION and ORDER MODIFYING the Scheduling Order, document 76 , as follows: Non-Expert Discovery due by 2/25/2020; Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 3/24/2020; Rebuttal Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 4/22/2020; Expert Discovery due by 6/2/2020; Dispositive Motions filed by 7/14/2020; Pretrial Conference set for 11/16/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd; and Jury Trial set for 1/26/2021 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/12/2019. (Rooney, M)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 110 Stipulated Order re: discovery of electronically stored information for standard litigation, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/7/2019. (Rosales, Otilia)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER re Stipulation to Elect Referral of Action to Voluntary Dispute Resolution Program (VDRP) Pursuant to Local Rule 271 signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 9/27/2018. (Jessen, A)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER GRANTING 77 & 78 Defendants' Motions to Dismiss signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/7/2018. (Jessen, A)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 93 STIPULATION and PROTECTIVE ORDER governing disclosure of confidential information signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/9/2018. (Rooney, M)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 Order rejecting stipulated protective order, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/19/2018. (Rosales, O)
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' 45 48 Motions to Dismiss, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/2/2018. (Gaumnitz, R)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Joint stipulation to continue scheduling conference and Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/8/2018. Initial Scheduling Conference currently set for 1/22/2018 has been CONTINUED to 3/5/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. The parties shall submit a Joint Scheduling Report and exchange initial disclosures at least seven days before the date of the rescheduled Initial Scheduling Conference. (Rosales, O)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING the parties' request for a continuance of the Scheduling Conference currently set for 12/4/2017 and CONTINUING it to 1/22/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/16/2017. (Rooney, M)
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING the parties' stipulation for an extension of time for Defendants to respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint as follows: August 21, 2017, shall be the last date for Defendants to answer or otherwise res pond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint; October 4, 2017, shall be the last date for Plaintiff to file an opposition to Defendants'answer or challenge to the First Amended Complaint; October 18, 2017, shall be the last date for Defendan ts to respond to Plaintiff's opposition to Defendants' answer or challenge to the First Amended Complaint; and the Initial Scheduling Conference currently noticed for September 27, 2017, is continued and will now be held on December 4, 2017 , at 10:30 am before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. The parties are reminded to file a joint scheduling report one full week prior to the conference and email a copy of same, in Word format, to epgorders@caed.uscourts.gov. Telephonic appearances are granted with the parties each directed to use the following dial-in number and passcode: 1-888-251-2909; passcode 1024453. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/7/2017. (Rooney, M)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Granting Plaintiff Leave to File First Amended Complaint and Deny 29 31 Motions to Dismiss as Moot, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 6/29/2017. (Plaintiff shall file a first amended complaint by 7/7/2017.)(Gaumnitz, R)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING the parties' request for an extension of the following deadlines and hearings: June 7, 2017, shall be the last date for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond toPlaintiff's Complaint; July 7, 2017, shall be the last date for Plaintiff to file an opposition to Defendants' answer or challenge to the Complaint; July 17, 2017, shall be the last date for Defendants to respond to Plaintiff's opposition to Defendants' answer or challenge to the Complaint; and the Initial Scheduling Conference currently set for June 13, 2017, is continued and will now be held on July 26, 2017, at 9:30 am in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. The parties are to file their joint sc heduling report one full week prior to the conference. Telephonic appearances are granted with each party directed to use the following dial-in number and passcode: 1-888-251-2909; passcode 1024453. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/8/2017. (Rooney, M)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER setting an Initial Scheduling Conference set for 4/17/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/22/2016. (Rooney, M)
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER unsealing Complaint and Notices Declining Intervention signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 12/16/2016. (Lundstrom, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America et al v. Somina, Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Michael Anderson Berry(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of California
Represented By: Isabel Melissa Daniels
Represented By: Wilmer J. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole O'Neill
Represented By: Isabel Melissa Daniels
Represented By: Wilmer J. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Somina, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Primary Anesthesia Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy Winston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Byron Mendenhall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quinn Gee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Vassilev, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?