Carter v. Ahlin
Plaintiff: Ishmael Carter
Defendant: Pam Ahlin
Case Number: 1:2015cv00483
Filed: March 5, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL of Action, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 6/1/15. CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting 2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 03/30/2015. (Flores, E)
March 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:15-cv-0498 EFB) to Fresno (1:15-cv-0483 DLB) signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 3/25/15. (Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter v. Ahlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ishmael Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pam Ahlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?