Thomas v. Rene Wilkinson , et al
Plaintiff: Josh Thomas
Defendant: Rene Wilkinson and Jasmine Tehrani
Case Number: 1:2015cv00527
Filed: April 2, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER DENYING Motion for Reconsideration; ORDER DENYING Motion for Disqualification of Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin 68 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 07/28/17. (Martin-Gill, S)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS, Recommending That Defendant Wilkinson's Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Case as Barred By Statute of Limitations Be Granted, With Prejudice, and That This Dismissal Be Subject to the Three Strikes Provision of 28:1915(g) 43 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 7/5/17: 14-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER STRIKING Impermissible Surreply 64 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/28/17. (Hellings, J)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER Addressing Objection to Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Time 55 and Objections to Findings and Recommendations 57 ; and Confirming Adoption of Findings and Recommendations to Grant Defendant Tehrani's Motion to Dismiss, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 05/4/2017. (Martin-Gill, S)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS in FULL 49 ; ORDER GRANTING Defendant Tehrani's Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Claims Against Her as Barred By Statute of Limitations, With Prejudice 31 ; ORDER DISMISSING Defendant Tehrani From This Action, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/22/17: This case is referred back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. (Hellings, J)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS, Recommending That Defendant Tehrani's Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss the Claims Against Her as Barred By Statute of Limitations Be Granted 31 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/10/17: 30-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER GRANTING Defendant Tehrani's Motion to Strike 38 ; ORDER STRIKING Plaintiff's Surreply 37 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/18/17. (Hellings, J)
March 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration 17 , signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/3/16. (Verduzco, M)
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Finding Certain Claims Cognizable and Dismissing Remaining Claims, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 10/5/15. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Thirty-Day Objection Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
July 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER ADOPTING 9 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS IN FULL and ORDER DENYING 7 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 7/6/2015. (Jessen, A)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Action 7 , signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 5/28/15: Thirty-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Rene Wilkinson , et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josh Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rene Wilkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jasmine Tehrani
Represented By: Andrew James Whisnand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?