Fells v. United States of America
Petitioner: Qasim Shane Fells
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2015cv00552
Filed: April 10, 2015
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Merced
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER DISMISSING Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus for Lack of Jurisdiction, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/21/16. CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C)
November 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Amend Caption signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/1/2016. (Jessen, A)
September 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER DENYING 21 Motion to Compel as Moot, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/19/16. (Marrujo, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fells v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Qasim Shane Fells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: Litigation Coordinator
Represented By: US Attorney's Office- 2241 Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?