Goolsby v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Clifford Dean Goolsby
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2015cv00615
Filed: April 20, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER AWARDING ATTORNEY'S FEES Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/22/2017. (Hall, S)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER DIRECTING Entry of Judgment In Favor of Plaintiff Clifford Dean Goolsby and Against Defendant Nancy Berryhill, Acting Commissioner of Social Security, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 03/21/17. REMANDING CASE to Commissioner of Social Security (Sentence four). Copy of remand order sent to other court. CASE CLOSED (Martin-Gill, S)
January 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING 16 Extension of Time, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/13/2016. Confidential letter brief due by 2/8/2016. (Hall, S)
July 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting 7 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; ORDER Directing Clerk to Issue Summons, Social Security Case Documents, and Scheduling Order; ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Complete the Service Documents, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/1/15. (Gonzalez, R)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DISCHARGING 4 Order to Show Cause and ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff an Extension of Time to File Amended Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/29/2015. Amended Application for IFP due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
May 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE Why Sanctions Should Not Be Imposed for Failure to Comply With the Court's Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/13/2015. Show Cause Response due within 14 days. (Hall, S)
April 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DIRECTING Plaintiff to File an Amended Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/23/2015. Amended application due within 14 days. (Hall, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goolsby v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford Dean Goolsby
Represented By: Melissa Newel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?