Singh et al v. Bunch et al
Plaintiff: Praveen Singh and Joyteshna Karan
Defendant: Kirk Bunch, Frank Navarro, John Evers, David Harris, Birgit Fladager, County of Stanislaus, Stanislaus County Sheriff Department and Adam Christianson
Case Number: 1:2015cv00646
Filed: April 27, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Stanislaus
Presiding Judge: UnassignedDJ
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Dismiss Action, with Prejudice, for Failure to Obey Court Orders and Failure to Prosecute re 91 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/4/18. Referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R Due Within Fourteen Days. (Gonzalez, R)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER GRANTING In Part and Denying In Part Defendants' 82 Motion for Sanctions, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/20/18. (Marrujo, C)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER REQUIRING Plaintiffs' Counsel to Personally Appear to SHOW CAUSE Why Sanctions Should Not be Imposed for Failure to Appear, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/16/18. Show Cause Hearing set for 11/30/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Marrujo, C)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting Defendants' 77 Motion to Compel Reponses to written discovery signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/17/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER Granting 63 Motion to Set Aside Default, Quash Service, and Dismiss Defendant Navarro signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/24/2017. Frank Navarro terminated.(Flores, E)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER Denying 69 Exparte Application to Continue October 17, 2017 Hearing, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/11/2017. (Gaumnitz, R)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER GRANTING Defendant John Ever's 49 Motion to Dismiss Claims against him and Motion to Quash Service; Defendant Evers and all claims against him are dismissed from this action; matter referred back to assigned Magistrate Judge, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 07/6/17. (Martin-Gill, S)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' 33 Motion to Dismiss, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/11/2017. (The matter is referred back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings.) (Gaumnitz, R)
January 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 1/6/2016 ORDERING defendants' 15 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Plaintiffs have fourteen days to file an amended complaint. (Zignago, K.)
November 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 11/17/15 ORDERING the Initial Scheduling Conference is CONTINUED to 2/1/16 at 09:00 AM; A further joint status report shall be filed no later than fourteen (14) days prior to the Status Conference, in which Plaintiffs shall address their efforts to prosecute this case against Defendants Frank Navarro and John Evers. Plaintiffs are notified that these defendants may be dismissed with prejudice under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b) if Plain tiffs fail to prosecute their claim(s) against them. To avoid dismissal, on or before 11/30/15, Plaintiffs shall file proof of service for these defendants or a sufficient explanation why service was not completed within Rule 4(m)'s prescribed service period. (Becknal, R)
October 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 10/13/2015 ORDERING 21 Status Conference CONTINUED to 11/23/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr.; a joint status report shall be filed 14 days prior to the hearing. (Reader, L)
August 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 8/13/15 ORDERING that Defendant's MOTION to DISMISS 15 is CONTINUED to 9/14/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singh et al v. Bunch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Praveen Singh
Represented By: Alejandro H Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyteshna Karan
Represented By: Alejandro H Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirk Bunch
Represented By: John Robert Whitefleet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Navarro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Evers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Harris
Represented By: John Robert Whitefleet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Birgit Fladager
Represented By: John Robert Whitefleet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Stanislaus
Represented By: John Robert Whitefleet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanislaus County Sheriff Department
Represented By: John Robert Whitefleet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Christianson
Represented By: John Robert Whitefleet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?