Stark v. Holland
Petitioner: Arden Earl Stark
Respondent: Kim Holland
Case Number: 1:2015cv00651
Filed: April 14, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Sandra M. Snyder
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Denial of the 1 Petition signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 4/13/2016. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Objections to F&R due by 5/16/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
December 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER regarding MOTION for Clarification 11 signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 12/11/2015. (Lundstrom, T)
April 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER of INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:15-cv-0804 DAD) to Fresno (1:15-cv-0651 SMS) signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/27/15. (Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stark v. Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Arden Earl Stark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kim Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?