Martinez v. City of Clovis, et al.
Plaintiff: Desiree Martinez
Defendant: City Of Clovis, Sanger City, Channon High, Kyle Pennington, Kim Pennington, Connie Pennington, Kristina Hershberger, Jesus Santillan, Angela Yambupah, Ralph Salazar and Fred Sanders
Case Number: 1:2015cv00683
Filed: May 1, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: UnassignedDJ
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 104 PARTIAL JUDGMENT ISSUED by District Judge John A. Mendez on 12/5/17 in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54(b). Defendants Jesus Santillan, Ralph Salazar, Kristina Hershberger, Angela Yambupah, Fred Sanders, the City of Clovis, the C ity of Sanger, Channon High, Kim Pennington and Connie Pennington are DISMISSED with prejudice. The plaintiff's claims against Defendant Kyle Pennington have not been adjudicated and are not affected by this partial judgment. (Kastilahn, A)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 11/22/2017 GRANTING 85 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. (Hunt, G)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 JUDGMENT signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 11/21/2017 ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that: Plaintiff take nothing, and that all claims for relief be dismissed against Defendants City of Clovis, City of Sanger, KristinaHersberger, Angela Yambupah, and Fred Sanders; Plaintiff take nothing for the claimed Equal Protection Violation and that claim for relief be dismissed against Defendant Channon High. (Becknal, R)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 6/8/17 ORDERING that defendants Jesus Santillan and Ralph Salazar are DISMISSED with prejudice, with each party bearing his or her own costs and fees. (Kastilahn, A)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 5/22/2017 ORDERING that scheduling order dates are EXTENDED as follows: Expert Rebuttal Disclosure Deadline: 6/23/2017; Expert Discovery Completion Deadline: 7/28/2017; Non dispositive motions to be filed by: 8/8/2017; Dispositive Motions to be filed by: 8/15/2017. (Zignago, K.)
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/9/2017 ORDERING Discovery due by 5/5/2017 for the purposes of conducting depositions only; the parties do not stipulate to continue the current cut-off of 3/15/2017 with respects to w ritten discovery; Expert Disclosure due by 5/12/2017, Supplemental expert witness disclosures by 5/26/2017; Expert Discovery completed by 6/23/2017; Non-Dispositive Motions by 6/30/2017; Dispositive Motions filed by 7/11/2017, noticed for hearing on 8/8/2017 at 1:30 PM.(Reader, L) Modified on 3/10/2017 (Reader, L).
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 PROTECTIVE ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 1/30/2017. (Lafata, M)
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 8/12/16 ORDERING that the current discovery deadlines should be EXTENDED as follows: (a) Non-expert Discovery shall be completed by 3/15/17; (b) Expert witness shall be disclosed by 3 /15/17; (c) Supplemental expert witnesses shall be disclosed by 3/29/17; and (d) Expert Discovery shall be completed by 5/26/17. The current trial and pretrial deadlines should be EXENDED as follows: (a) Non-dispositive Motions shall be filed no la ter than 6/4/17; (b) Dispositive Motions shall be filed no later than 6/27/17 and noticed for hearing on 7/25/17 at 1:30 p.m.; (c) A joint pretrial statement shall be filed on or before 9/29/17; (d) a Pretrial Conference shall be held on 10/6/17 at 10:00 a.m.; and (e) Jury trial shall be set for 12/4/17 at 9:00 a.m.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER denying defendants' 50 Motion to Dismiss, signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 8/8/16. These eight Defendants must file their Answers to the SAC within 20 days from the date of this order. (Kastilahn, A)
January 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 1/5/16 GRANTING in part and DENYING in part Defendants' MOTION to DISMISS Plaintiff's First, Second, Fourth and Eleventh Claims for Relief in the First Amended Complaint 16 . The Court DENIES the Def endants' MOTION to DISMISS Plaintiff's claims for due process violations against Clovis and the individual Defendants and DENIES the MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's request for punitive damages. If Plaintiff elects to amend any of the claims dismissed herein, she shall file her Second Amended Complaint within twenty days of the date of this Order. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 12/2/15: Jury Trial RESET for 5/15/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Judge John A. Mendez. (Kaminski, H)
November 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STATUS (Pre-trial Scheduling) ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 11/3/15. All dispositive motions due by 12/13/2016. Hearing on such motions shall be on 1/20/2017 at 1:30 p.m.. All discovery due by 11/4/2016. Designation of Expert Witness es due by 9/2/2016, and rebuttal expert disclosures due by 9/16/2016. The Final Pretrial Conference is set for 2/24/2017 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Judge John A. Mendez. Jury Trial is set for 4/3/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Judge John A. Mendez. (Kastilahn, A)
May 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 5/26/15. (Marrujo, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. City of Clovis, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of Clovis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanger City
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Channon High
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Pennington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Pennington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Pennington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristina Hershberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesus Santillan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Yambupah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph Salazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Desiree Martinez
Represented By: Kevin Gerard Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?