Lobato v. Gomez, et al.
Plaintiff: Rachel Lobato
Defendant: Everardo O. Gomez and Dolores B. Gomez
Case Number: 1:2015cv00686
Filed: May 5, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: UnassignedDJ
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER DIRECTING the Clerk of the Court to Close the Case, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/28/17. CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER for statement from the parties re standing. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/23/2017. (Rooney, M)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting, in part, and denying, in part, plaintiff's motion in limine no. 2, document [61-1]. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/8/2017. (Rooney, M)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER GRANTING defendants' Motion to Continue Trial, document 88 . The Jury Trial currently set to commence on 3/7/2017 is CONTINUED and will now be held on 6/27/2017 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. A Pretrial Conference is set for 6/26/2017 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/1/2017. (Rooney, M)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting in part and denying in part defendants' Motion in Limine, document 62 . Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/27/2017. (Rooney, M)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER on Motions in Limine, documents 61 and 62 . Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/23/2017. (Rooney, M)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Plaintiff Rachel Lobatos request to appear by telephone at Pretrial Conference; Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/5/2017. (Rosales, O)
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Order DENYING Plaintiff's 33 Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/31/2016. (Dean, J)
October 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING the continuance of the pretrial and trial dates as follows: Pretrial Conference CONTINUED to 1/9/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean and Jury Trial CONTINUED to 3/7/2017 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/6/2016. (Rooney, M)
August 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING the parties' request to continue the Motion for Summary Judgment/Adjudication hearing currently set for 9/9/2016, with a new hearing date of 9/23/2016 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. The Court further modifies the briefing schedule as follows: any opposition due by 9/9/2016 and any reply(ies) due by 9/16/2016. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/26/2016. (Rooney, M)
January 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND ADMONISHING DEFENDANTS COUNSEL TO FAMILIARIZE HERSELF WITH LOCAL AND FEDERAL RULES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/19/2016. (Hernandez, M)
January 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER REQUIRING DEFENDANT TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT ISSUE FOR THE FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THE SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/8/2016. (Hernandez, M)
January 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION Granting Plaintiff Leave to File First Amended Complaint; ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/7/2016. Plaintiff's 18 Motion to Amend the Complaint is denied as moot; the hearing on the motion set for 1/29/2016 at 10:00 a.m. is vacated. (Martinez, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lobato v. Gomez, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Lobato
Represented By: Tanya E. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Everardo O. Gomez
Represented By: Kathleen Marie Phillips-Vieira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dolores B. Gomez
Represented By: Kathleen Marie Phillips-Vieira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?