Baker v. Cacoa et al
Plaintiff: Mike Baker
Defendant: S. Cacoa, Y. Ponce De Leon, D. Guizar, L. Vasquez, Seng, E. Beam, Vagel, Cuevas, T. Caldwell and R. Cervantes
Case Number: 1:2015cv00693
Filed: May 6, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER Regarding Stipulated Dismissal of Action signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 07/18/2018. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER Following Settlement, Vacating Dates and Directing Parties to File Dispositive Documents signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 07/17/2018. Fourteen-Day Deadline. (Flores, E)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER Setting Settlement Conference on July 16, 2018 at California State Prison, Corcoran,signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 05/18/18. (Settlement Conference set for 7/16/2018 at 08:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone at CSP-Corcoran)(Copy of this order forwarded to CSP-Corcoran Litigation Coordinator as directed) (Martin-Gill, S)
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER DENYING 62 Plaintiff's Motion Requesting Court to Modify the Scheduling Order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/3/2018. (Jessen, A)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER AMENDING 36 October 5, 2017, Discovery and Scheduling Order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/20/2018. Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment due by 3/16/2018. (Jessen, A)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Regarding Defendants' Notice of Withdrawal of 39 Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/29/18. (Marrujo, C)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 48 Motion to Stay Summary Judgment Motion for Discovery Under Rule 56 signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/10/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER GRANTING 44 Plaintiff's Motion to Substitute Name of Defendant "Jane Doe" as "D. Osuma" and ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Second Amended Complaint Within Thirty (30) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/3/2018. (Jessen, A)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Regarding Defendants' Request to Stay Non-Exhaustion Discovery, and Plaintiff's Request for Modification of the Discovery and Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/17/17. 39 , 40 and 41 (Martin-Gill, S)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion for Subpoena Duces Tecum 30 ; ORDER and NOTICE Authorizing Issuance of Subpoena Duces Tecum, and DIRECTING Clerk's Office to Serve Copy of Subpoena With Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/5/17: 10-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER ADOPTING 24 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS IN FULL and ORDER DISMISSING Certain Claims and Defendants R. Cervantes, Cuevas, Vagel, E. Beam and T. Caldwell signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/21/2017. (Jessen, A)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 25 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/5/17. (Gonzalez, R)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to File a Motion to Substitute the Doe Defendant(s) or File a Request for a Rule 45 Subpoena, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/31/17. 45-Day Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 18 Motion for Early Discovery, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/20/17. (Marrujo, C)
November 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SEVERING Unrelated Claims; DIRECTING Clerk to Assign a Separate Case Number, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/15/16. (Marrujo, C)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 3 Motion for Relief from E-Service Procedures to Enlarge the 25 Page Limit for Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/29/15. (Verduzco, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. Cacoa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Cacoa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Y. Ponce De Leon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Guizar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Vasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Beam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vagel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cuevas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Cervantes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?