Ricks v. Kamena et al
Plaintiff: Scott K. Ricks
Defendant: C. Kamena, E. Gonzalez, P. Davis, S. Alfaro, R. Briggs and J. Angulo
Case Number: 1:2015cv00715
Filed: May 8, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER Granting Defendant's 63 Motion to Dismiss signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 05/07/2019. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Regarding Defendant's Failure to File a Pretrial Statement signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 04/23/2019. Seven-Day Deadline. (Flores, E)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Action should not be Dismissed for Failure to Comply with Court Order and Failure to Prosecute; Show Cause Response due within Fourteen (14) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/18/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER SETTING Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/16/18. (Marrujo, C)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER to RECAPTION Case, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/25/18. (Marrujo, C)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER ADOPTING 52 Findings and Recommendations Denying Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/24/18. (Marrujo, C)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Defendant Kamena's 32 Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 08/30/2018. Referred to Judge Drozd; Objections to F&R due by 9/17/2018.(Flores, E)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER DENYING 49 Motion for Transfer of Venue, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/6/18. (Martin-Gill, S)
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Denying 46 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/3/18. (Gonzalez, R)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER ADOPTING 44 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and Dismissing Certain Claims and Defendants signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 02/26/2018. (Flores, E)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Dismiss Certain Claims and Defendants, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/29/18. Referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R Due Within Fourteen Days. (Gonzalez, R)
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER denying 33 Motion to Amend and directing Plaintiff to file opposition or statement of non-opposition to 32 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/7/2017. (Filing Deadline: 12/11/2017). (Lundstrom, T)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Regarding Operative Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 09/11/2017. (Flores, E)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Discharging 26 Order to Show Cause; ORDER Directing Defendant to File Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Continue Proceedings signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 06/21/2017. (Flores, E)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE why this Action Should not be Dismissed for Failure to Obey a Court Order and Failure to Prosecute signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 06/05/2017. (Flores, E)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING 24 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Pleading and Directing Plaintiff to File a First Amended Complaint Within Thirty (30) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/18/2017. (Jessen, A)
January 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DENYING 12 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/6/2016. (Jessen, A)
June 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Denying 9 Plaintiff's Request for Entry of Default, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/25/15. (Gonzalez, R)
May 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Denying 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 05/11/2015. (Flores, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ricks v. Kamena et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott K. Ricks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Kamena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Alfaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Briggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Angulo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?