Kurbegovich v. Unknown
Petitioner: Muharem Kurbegovich
Respondent: Unknown
Case Number: 1:2015cv00716
Filed: April 23, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DISMISSING Petition For Writ Of Habeas Corpus, ORDER Directing Clerk Of Court To Close Case, ORDER Declining To Issue Certificate Of Appealability, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/6/2015. CASE CLOSED.(Fahrney, E)
June 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DISMISSING PETITION, Granting Petitioner Leave to Amend on his Claim Concerning the Denial by the Board of Parole, Construing Petitioner's Claim Concerning Restrictions to Mail as a Civil Rights Complaint and Dismissing the Civil Rights Complaint without Prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/18/2015. (Flores, E)
May 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER of INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:15-cv-0876 GGH) to Fresno (1:15-cv-0716 SAB) signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 05/11/15. (Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kurbegovich v. Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Muharem Kurbegovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?