Hopson v. Montanez et al
Plaintiff: Cynthia Hopson
Defendant: Eliaser Montanez, John Simon and Rosemary Simon
Case Number: 1:2015cv00803
Filed: May 26, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Stanislaus
Presiding Judge: UnassignedDJ
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER DISCHARGING JUNE 21, 2017 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/28/2017. (Hernandez, M)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Close Case and Adjust Docket to Reflect Voluntary Dismissal, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/27/17. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER REQUIRING PARTIES TO FILE RESPONSE TO JUNE 21, 2017 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that all parties shall file a written response to the June 21, 2017 order to show cause on or before June 28, 2017 by 5:00 pm. Failure to comply with this order will result in the issuance of sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/27/2017. (Hernandez, M)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER REQUIRING ALL PARTIES to SHOW CAUSE why Sanctions Should Not Issue for the Failure to Comply with a Court Order 58 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/20/17. Show Cause Response due by 6/26/2017. (Gonzalez, R)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO ALLOW PLAINTIFF ABILITY TO REOPEN CASE AFTER DISMISSAL IF NECESSARY. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs request to allow Plaintiff the ability to reopen the case after dismissal is DENIED. If the parties wish for the Court to retain jurisdiction to enforce the settlement agreement until January 15, 2018, such language should be included in the dispositional documents filed in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/20/2017. (Hernandez, M)
March 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER VACATING DATES AND MATTERS AND DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE DISPOSITIONAL DOCUMENTS WITHIN NINETY DAYS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/14/2017. (Hernandez, M)
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to File Clarification re Declaration by 3/13/2017, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/10/2017. (Kusamura, W)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Vacating MARCH 22, 2017 Hearing signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/9/2017: It is hereby ordered that the hearing set for March 22, 2017, is VACATED and the parties will not be required to appear at that time. (Valdez, E)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Discharging Order to Show Cause 34 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/8/17. (Gonzalez, R)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER REQUIRING MICHAEL S. WARDA TO SHOW CAUSE FOR HIS FAILURE TO APPEAR ON JANUARY 17, 2017. Response due by January 31, 2017; Show Cause Hearing February 8, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/17/2017. (Hernandez, M)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Order re request to withdraw Notice of Settlement; Order setting scheduling conference for January 17, 2017, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/4/2017. (Scheduling Conference set for 1/17/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone) (Rosales, O)
December 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. ORDER REQUIRING PARTIES TO FILE DISPOSITIONAL DOCUMENTS OR WITHDRAWAL OF NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT BY DECEMBER 31, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/12/2016. (Hernandez, M)
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER REQUIRING Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE Why this Action should not be Dismissed for Failure to Comply with a Court Order; Show Cause Response due in Five Days signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/7/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
November 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE DISPOSITIVE DOCUMENTS on or before December 5, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/2/2016. (Hernandez, M)
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER REQUIRING PARTIES TO FILE DISPOSITIONAL DOCUMENTS. All pending matters and dates are VACATED; and the parties shall file dispositional documents on or before October 28, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/13/2016. (Hernandez, M)
October 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION and ORDER to Continue the Scheduling Conference currently set for 10/19/2015 to 11/17/2015 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/14/2015. (Kusamura, W)
September 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION and ORDER to continue the Scheduling Conference from 9/15/2015 to 10/19/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/10/2015. (Hernandez, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hopson v. Montanez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Hopson
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Malakauskas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eliaser Montanez
Represented By: Michael S Warda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosemary Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?