Madrigal v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC et al
Plaintiff: Norma Madrigal
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC and Barrett Daffin Frappier Treder & Weiss, LLP
Case Number: 1:2015cv00809
Filed: May 28, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Tulare
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER Granting Nationstar Mortgage LLC's 56 Motion fro Summary Judgment re 56 , 57 , 60 , 62 , 69 , 70 , 73 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/10/17. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER GRANTING IN PART REQUEST TO SEAL DOCUMENTS. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLCs request to file documents under seal is GRANTED, and within four (4) days of the date of entry of this order, Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC shall email a copy of the unredacted documents to saborders@caed.uscourts.gov so that they may be filed under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/1/2017. (Hernandez, M)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER VACATING March 8, 2017 Hearing on Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/24/17. (Marrujo, C)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER REQUIRING DEFENDANT TO SUPPLEMENT MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/22/2017: It is hereby ordered that Defendant Nationstar Mortgage shall file a supplement to the motion for summary judgment which includes the note at issue in this action on or before February 27, 2017. (Valdez, E)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S REQUEST TO SEAL DOCUMENTS (ECF No. 58 ) FIVE-DAY DEADLINE signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/17/2017: It is hereby ordered that Defendant's motion to file documents under seal is DENIED. Withi n five days from the date of entry of this order, Defendant shall: file a renewed motion to file documents under seal specifically identifying the information which is entitled to protection and the compelling reasons that exist to file the informati on under seal; and file any documents in support of the motion for summary judgment for which the Court has denied the motion to seal; and the Court will not consider any of the documents submitted in the motion to seal unless they are filed in the record or a renewed request to seal is granted. (Valdez, E)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER GRANTING 61 Defendant's Motion to File Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/2/2017. (Hernandez, M)
July 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER GRANTING Request to Withdraw as Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/18/16. (Marrujo, C)
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER GRANTING Defendant Barrett Daffin Frappier Treder & Weiss, LLP'S Request to be Excused from MAY 26, 2016 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/24/2016. (Kusamura, W)
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER re SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/20/2016. (Timken, A)
February 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER CONTINUING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. The Settlement Conference currently set for 2/11/2016, is CONTINUED to 5/26/2016, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/5/2016. (Timken, A)
December 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER re SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 12/28/2015. (Timken, A)
November 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Protective Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/20/2015. (Rosales, O)
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk's Office to TERMINATE Bryan M. Leifer as Counsel for Defendant signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/14/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
September 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER RE Non-Monetary Status of Defendant Barrett Daffin Frappier Treder & Weiss, LLP signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/9/2015. (Sant Agata, S)
July 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER PARTIALLY GRANTING 15 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint on or before 8/5/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/22/2015. (Hernandez, M)
June 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Denying as Moot 4 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/18/2015. (Hernandez, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Madrigal v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norma Madrigal
Represented By: Lauren Rode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Bryan M. Leifer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barrett Daffin Frappier Treder & Weiss, LLP
Represented By: James T. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?