Applegate v. Trausch
Plaintiff: Brian Applegate
Defendant: Christian Trausch
Case Number: 1:2015cv00811
Filed: May 29, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 41 AND REOPENING DISCOVERY AND EXTENDING DEADLINES signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/8/2017. New deadline for initial disclosures: 07/07/17. New deadline for exhaustion motions: 08/07/2017. New deadline to amend pleadings: 09/07/2017. New discovery deadline: 10/10/2017. New dispositive motions deadline: 12/07/2017.(Lundstrom, T)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER LIFTING STAY of Proceedings Imposed on March 29, 2016; ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 40 Motion for Reconsideration; ORDER for Plaintiff to (1) SHOW CAUSE Why this Case should not be Dismissed, or (2) FILE Motion for Voluntary Dismissal; Twenty-Day Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/19/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER RE Request for Judicial Notice; ORDER for Plaintiff to FILE Updated Status Report within 14 Days, as Directed by this Order signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/28/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER for Defendant to File Status Report within Thirty Days signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/11/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
July 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER CONTINUING STAY OF ACTION signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 7/22/2016. (Jessen, A)
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING Defendant's Motion to Stay All Proceedings and ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 22 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 3/29/2016. (Jessen, A)
February 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DIRECTING Defendant to Consent to or Decline United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction within Fifteen Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 02/29/2016. (15-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
January 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of This Court's Expedited Trial Setting Procedures Upon Consent of All Parties, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 1/12/16. (Marrujo, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Applegate v. Trausch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Applegate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christian Trausch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?