Tarrance v. Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Donald Lee Tarrance
Defendant: Tara Johnson, Kim Craddock and Samuel Leach
Case Number: 1:2015cv00858
Filed: June 8, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Calaveras
Presiding Judge: UnassignedDJ
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to ASSIGN a Fresno District Judge to this Action; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Dismissal of this 1 Action for Failure to Obey a Court Order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/16/2015. Referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii; Objections to F&R due by 12/4/2015. The new case number is 1:15-cv-00858-AWI-BAM. (Sant Agata, S)
October 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCREENING ORDER Dismissing 1 Complaint With Leave to Amend, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/2/15. Amended Complaint Due Within Thirty Days. (Gonzalez, R)
June 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 FIRST INFORMATIONAL ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/15/15. (Verduzco, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tarrance v. Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Lee Tarrance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tara Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Craddock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Leach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?