Wyatt v. Sundaram
Plaintiff: Ricky Wyatt
Defendant: Sundaram
Case Number: 1:2015cv00895
Filed: June 1, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Defendant's 46 Motion for Summary Judgment and Denying Defendant's 57 Motion to Strike Surreply signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/9/2017. Referred to Judge Dale A. Drozd. Objections to F&R due by 11/13/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER Denying 59 Motion for Reconsideration signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 09/25/2017. (Flores, E)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER DENYING, Without Prejudice, 45 Plaintiff's Second Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/27/2017. (Jessen, A)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER DENYING, Without Prejudice, 43 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/7/2017. (Jessen, A)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER DECLINING to Adopt 31 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, DENYING 29 Motion to Revoke Plaintiff's In Forma Pauperis Status, and REFERRING back to Magistrate Judge signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/30/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
October 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 30 and 33 Motion to Compel and Requests for Reasonable Expenses, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/5/16. (Martin-Gill, S)
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending to Grant Defendant's 29 Motion to Revoke Plaintiff's In Forma Pauperis Status signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 09/19/2016. Referred to Judge Drozd; Objections to F&R due by 10/24/2016.(Flores, E)
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:15-cv-1181 DAD) to Fresno (1:15-cv-0895 SKO) signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 6/11/15. (Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wyatt v. Sundaram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sundaram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?