California Sportfishing Protection Alliance et al v. United States Bureau of Reclamation et al
Plaintiff: California Sportfishing Protection Alliance, California Water Impact Network, AquAlliance and Restore The Delta
Defendant: United States Bureau of Reclamation, Sally Jewell, Thomas Howard, Felicia Marcus, Frances Spivy-Weber, Tam M. Dudoc, Steven Moore, Dorene D'Adamo and California Department of Water Resources
Unknown: San Luis & Delta-Mendota Water Authority
Intervenor_defendant: Westlands Water District, Oakdale Irrigation District and South San Joaquin Irrigation District
Case Number: 1:2015cv00912
Filed: June 3, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER TO DISMISS CLAIMS and CLOSE CASE signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 11/10/2015. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
October 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER GRANTING FEDERAL DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS (Doc. 50) signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on October 20, 2015. (Munoz, I)
September 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 59 STIPULATION to Continue the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference; ORDER - hereby continues the October 6, 2015 Scheduling Conference to December 9, 2015 at 8:30am in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Judge McAuliffe. Parties shall file their Joint Statement 7 days prior to the date of the Scheduling Conference. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/30/2015. (Herman, H)
July 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER GRANTING 31 Oakdale Irrigation District's and San Joaquin Irrigation District's Motion to Intervene signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 7/24/2015. (Jessen, A)
July 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER GRANTING 9 San Luis & Delta-Mendota Water Authority and Westlands Water District's Motion to Intervene signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 7/23/2015. (Jessen, A)
July 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER CLOSING Sacramento Case and Transferring All Filings Docketed After June 16, 2015 in Sacramento Case to Fresno Case Docket signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 7/8/2015. OLD CASE NUMBER: 2:15-cv-01201-MCE-DAD. NEW CASE NUMBER: 1:15-cv-00912-LJO-BAM. (Jessen, A)
June 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RELATING and REASSIGNING CASE signed by District Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 6/16/2015. New Case No: 1:15-cv-00912-LJO-BAM. (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: California Sportfishing Protection Alliance et al v. United States Bureau of Reclamation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Sportfishing Protection Alliance
Represented By: Rebecca L. Davis
Represented By: Michael R. Lozeau
Represented By: Andrew L. Packard
Represented By: Megan E. Truxillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Water Impact Network
Represented By: Rebecca L. Davis
Represented By: Michael R. Lozeau
Represented By: Megan E. Truxillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AquAlliance
Represented By: Rebecca L. Davis
Represented By: Michael R. Lozeau
Represented By: Megan E. Truxillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Restore The Delta
Represented By: Rebecca L. Davis
Represented By: Michael R. Lozeau
Represented By: Megan E. Truxillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Bureau of Reclamation
Represented By: Norman Louis Rave, Jr., GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sally Jewell
Represented By: Norman Louis Rave, Jr., GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Howard
Represented By: Mark William Poole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Felicia Marcus
Represented By: Mark William Poole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frances Spivy-Weber
Represented By: Mark William Poole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tam M. Dudoc
Represented By: Mark William Poole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Moore
Represented By: Mark William Poole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorene D'Adamo
Represented By: Mark William Poole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Water Resources
Represented By: Deborah L. Barnes
Represented By: Daniel M. Fuchs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: San Luis & Delta-Mendota Water Authority
Represented By: Daniel Joseph O'Hanlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Westlands Water District
Represented By: Daniel Joseph O'Hanlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Oakdale Irrigation District
Represented By: Tim P O'Laughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: South San Joaquin Irrigation District
Represented By: Tim P O'Laughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?